blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970170

EP0970170 - STABLE MICROEMULSION CLEANING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 17.01.2007  [2007/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEONARD, Isabelle
Rue de Dinant 24
B-7000 Mons / BE
02 / DRAPIER, Julien
Rue de Tavier 192
B-4100 Seraing / BE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/02]Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date98906279.910.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US02541
Priority number, dateUS1997079708010.02.1997         Original published format: US 797080
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9835007
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970170
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:C11D1/83, C11D1/72, C11D3/20
[2000/02]
CPC:
C11D3/2068 (EP,US); C11D1/65 (EP,US); C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/86 (EP,US); C11D17/0021 (EP,US); C11D3/2093 (EP,US);
C11D3/323 (EP,US); C11D1/02 (EP,US); C11D1/143 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US); C11D1/523 (EP,US); C11D3/3418 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesRO10.08.1999
TitleGerman:STABILES REINIGUNGSMITTEL IN MIKROEMULSIONSFORM[2000/02]
English:STABLE MICROEMULSION CLEANING COMPOSITION[2000/02]
French:COMPOSITION STABLE DE NETTOYAGE SOUS FORME DE MICROEMULSION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase10.08.1999National basic fee paid 
10.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2003Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/03]
14.10.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.10.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/03]
Appeal following examination04.12.2003Appeal received No.  T0427/04
23.02.2004Statement of grounds filed
20.10.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
20.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB1382295  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 93 - page 2, line 15; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO8505066  (KOEGE KEMISK VAERK [DK]) [A] 1-4,6-8* abstract *;
 [A]EP0316726  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-4,6 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0368146  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9521239  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-4,6 * example 1; claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.