EP0981612 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetics Institute, LLC 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2002/26] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states GENETICS INSTITUTE, INC. 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBS, Kenneth 151 Beaumont Avenue Newton, MA 02160 / US | 02 /
MCCOY, John, M. 56 Howard Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | 03 /
LAVALLIE, Edward, R. 113 Ann Lee Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 04 /
RACIE, Lisa, A. 124 School Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 05 /
MERBERG, David 2 Orchard Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | 06 /
TREACY, Maurice 93 Walcott Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | 07 /
SPAULDING, Vikki 11 Meadowbank Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 08 /
AGOSTINO, Michael, J. 26 Wolcott Avenue Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2000/11] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
JACOBS, Kenneth 151 Beaumont Avenue Newton, MA 02160 / US | ||
02 /
MCCOY, John, M. 56 Howard Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | |||
03 /
LAVALLIE, Edward, R. 90 Green Meadow Drive Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US | |||
04 /
RACIE, Lisa, A. 124 School Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
05 /
MERBERG, David 2 Orchard Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
06 /
TREACY, Maurice 93 Walcott Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | |||
07 /
SPAULDING, Vikki 11 Meadowbank Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | |||
08 /
AGOSTINO, Michael, J. 26 Wolcott Avenue Andover, MA 01810 / US | Representative(s) | Frohwitter, Bernhard Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98906384.7 | 13.02.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998US02767 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9836067 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0981612 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C12N5/10, A61K38/17 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE | [2000/09] | English: | SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM | [2000/09] | French: | PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 27.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9707198 (GENETICS INSTITUTE, INC.) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5536637 (GENETICS INSTITUTE, INC.) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [X] - EmHum1 Database Entry Hsab2351 Accession number AB002351; 1 July 1997 NAGASE T. ET AL, XP002073785 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | [ ] - NAGASE T. ET AL., "Prediction of the coding sequences of unidentified human genes. VII. The complete sequences of 100 nw cDNA clones from brain which can code for large proteins in vitro", DNA RES., (1997), vol. 4, pages 141 - 150 | [X] - Trhum Database Entry O15061 Accession number O15061; 1 January 1998 NAGASE T. ET AL., XP002073786 [X] 6-12 * the whole document * | [ ] - DNA RES., (1997), vol. 4, pages 141 - 150 |