EP0960537 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR MERGING PILOT NEIGHBOR LISTS IN A MOBILE TELEPHONE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMDY, Walid, M. 4949 Sandshore Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/48] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98906387.0 | 13.02.1998 | [1999/48] | WO1998US02772 | Priority number, date | US19970800931 | 13.02.1997 Original published format: US 800931 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9836588 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0960537 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960537 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/00, H04Q7/38 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
H04W36/0061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/48] | H04Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG UM IN EINEM MOBIL-TELEFONSYSTEM NACHBAR-STEUERSIGNALLISTEN ZUSAMMENZUFÜGEN | [1999/48] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR MERGING PILOT NEIGHBOR LISTS IN A MOBILE TELEPHONE SYSTEM | [1999/48] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ETABLIR DES LISTES DE STATIONS VOISINES FUSIONNEES D'APRES LES SIGNAUX PILOTES DANS UN SYSTEME TELEPHONIQUE MOBILE | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04019847.5 / EP1487230 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.11.2005 | BE | 16.11.2005 | CH | 16.11.2005 | FI | 16.11.2005 | IT | 16.11.2005 | LI | 16.11.2005 | NL | 16.11.2005 | IE | 13.02.2006 | DK | 16.02.2006 | GR | 16.02.2006 | SE | 16.02.2006 | ES | 27.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | PT | 17.04.2006 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
IE | 13.02.2006 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 17.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
GR | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
BE | 16.11.2005 | ||
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 16.11.2005 | |
CH | 16.11.2005 | ||
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
DK | 16.02.2006 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 16.11.2005 | |
FI | 16.11.2005 | ||
LI | 16.11.2005 | ||
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | ||
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 16.11.2005 | |
NL | 16.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5267261 (BLAKENEY II ROBERT D [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,8-10 * column 9, line 3 - line 29 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 24 * * column 19, line 3 - line 22 * * column 19, line 65 - column 20, line 38 * * column 25, line 6 - line 53 *; | [A]US5327575 (MENICH BARRY J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8-10 * column 1, line 47 - line 56 * * column 2, line 24 - line 31 * * column 2, line 41 - line 49 * * column 4, line 30 - line 37 ** column 4, line 44 - line 63 *; | [A]US5428816 (BARNETT CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8-10 * column 7, line 46 - column 10, line 2 * * see claim 1 *; | [E]WO9819492 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [E] 1,2,6,8-10 * page 4, line 4 - line 11 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 2 * * page 13, line 4 - line 15 * * page 16, line 14 - line 24 * * page 16, line 24 - page 17, line 10 * * page 17, line 11 - page 18, line 21 * * see claims 24-29 * * figures 3,4 * |