EP0964983 - HYDRAULICALLY POWERED FAN SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 3000 University Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2356 / US | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHUR, Jeffrey, J. 4068 Shadowleaf Drive Bellbrook, OH 45305 / US | 02 /
HILL, John, S. 227, W. Siebenthaler Avenue Dayton, OH 45405 / US | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Steimle, Josef Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Steimle, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98906532.1 | 19.02.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998US03120 | Priority number, date | US19970800996 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: US 800996 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837318 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964983 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964983 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/04 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
F01P7/048 (EP,US);
B62D5/07 (EP,US);
F01P7/044 (EP,US);
Y10S60/912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1999/51] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCH ANGETRIEBENER KÜHLVENTILATOR FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [1999/51] | English: | HYDRAULICALLY POWERED FAN SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES | [1999/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE VENTILATION HYDRAULIQUE POUR VEHICULES | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.11.2003 | IT | 26.11.2003 | GB | 26.02.2004 | ES | 09.03.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 26.11.2003 | |
GB | 26.02.2004 | ||
ES | 09.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 26.02.2004 | |
ES | 09.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | ES | 09.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS62282110 ; | [XA]DE3626013 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,3-6,9 * the whole document * [A] 7,10,11; | [XA]US4738330 (SUZUKI MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 8 - column 9, line 9; figure - * [A] 2,7,8,10; | [XA]WO9616259 (ITT AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRICAL SYST [US]) [X] 3-6,9 * abstract * [A] 1,7,8 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880518), vol. 012, no. 164, Database accession no. (M - 698), & JP62282110 A 19871208 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,3-6,9 * abstract * [A] 7,8 |