EP0961786 - MOLECULAR WEIGHT CONTROLLED POLYMERS BY PHOTOPOLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGE, Charles, Thomas 2948 Mohawk Lane Rochester Hills, MI 48306 / US | 02 /
DESOBRY, Vincent 50, route du Confin CH-1723 Marly / CH | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 98906540.4 | 18.02.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998US03133 | Priority number, date | US19970038225P | 19.02.1997 Original published format: US 38225 P | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837104 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961786 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961786 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/48, C08F2/38 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C08F2/38 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/48 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1999/49] | Title | German: | MOLEKULARGEWICHT KONTROLLIERTE POLYMERE DURCH PHOTOPOLYMERISATION | [1999/49] | English: | MOLECULAR WEIGHT CONTROLLED POLYMERS BY PHOTOPOLYMERIZATION | [1999/49] | French: | POLYMERES A POIDS MOLECULAIRE REGULE PAR PHOTOPOLYMERISATION | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB861438 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]AU4691679 (UNISEARCH LTD) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,10 *; | JPH01167305 [ ] (KAO CORP); | JPH0384011 [ ] (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X] - "MANUFACTURE OF WATER-SOLUBLE LOW-MOLECULAR- WEIGHT VINYL POLYMERS BY PHOTOPOLYMERIZATION IN PRESENCE OF BISULFITE.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900108), vol. 112, no. 2, Database accession no. 8059, XP000187827 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - "PHOTOCURABLE COMPOSITIONS AND MANUFACTURE OF PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVES.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910923), vol. 115, no. 12, Database accession no. 116050, page 71, column 2, XP002072208 [X] 1-10 * abstract * |