EP0963342 - NEUTRAL-AGED HYDROPHOBIC SILICA GELS WITH REDUCED SURFACE AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Auburn, MI 48611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 2200 West Salzburg Road Auburn, MI 48611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Gary, T. Rue de la Marache 19 B B-1380 Lasne / BE | 02 /
DENG, Qin 306 Burning Bush Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | 03 /
HAHN, James, R. 2988 Martin Court Midland, MI 48640 / US | 04 /
REESE, Clifford, C. 3667 Acorn Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2000/11] |
Former [1999/50] | 01 /
BURNS, Gary, T. 2343 Deer Valley Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | ||
02 /
DENG, Qin 306 Burning Bush Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | |||
03 /
HAHN, James, R. 2988 Martin Court Midland, MI 48640 / US | |||
04 /
REESE, Clifford, C. 3667 Acorn Lane Midland, MI 48642 / US | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 98906599.0 | 18.02.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998US03311 | Priority number, date | US19970805097 | 24.02.1997 Original published format: US 805097 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837014 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963342 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963342 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/159 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B33/159 (KR);
C09C1/3081 (EP,US);
C01B33/16 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/50] | Title | German: | NEUTRAL GEALTERTE HYDROPHOBE KIESELSAÜREGELE MIT VERRINGERTER SPEZIFISCHER OBERFLÄCHE | [1999/50] | English: | NEUTRAL-AGED HYDROPHOBIC SILICA GELS WITH REDUCED SURFACE AREA | [1999/50] | French: | GELS DE SILICE HYDROPHOBES A VIEILLISSEMENT NEUTRE PRESENTANT UNE ZONE SUPERFICIELLE LIMITEE | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 24.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.04.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.10.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB783868 (MIDLAND SILICONES LTD) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [AD]US3015645 (TYLER LESLIE J) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AD]US3122520 (LENTZ CHARLES W) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0690023 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [AD] 1* example 1 * |