EP0964802 - RESTRAINING SYSTEM FOR TRUCK AND TRAILER WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Busse, Stuart A. 302 Main Street Biggar Saskatchewan S0K 0M0 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states Busse, Stuart A. 302 Main Street Biggar, Saskatchewan S0K 0M0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98906780.6 | 06.03.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998CA00183 | Priority number, date | CA19972199426 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: CA 2199426 | CA19972207692 | 27.06.1997 Original published format: CA 2207692 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9840245 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964802 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964802 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/00, B60R19/42 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
B60R19/42 (EP);
B60R19/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/51] | Title | German: | RÜCKHALTESYSTEM FÜR LASTKRAFTWAGEN UND ANHÄNGERWAGEN RÄDER | [1999/51] | English: | RESTRAINING SYSTEM FOR TRUCK AND TRAILER WHEELS | [1999/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE RETENUE DE ROUES DE CAMIONS ET DE REMORQUES | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.2003 | BE | 02.07.2003 | CH | 02.07.2003 | FI | 02.07.2003 | IT | 02.07.2003 | LI | 02.07.2003 | NL | 02.07.2003 | DK | 02.10.2003 | GR | 02.10.2003 | PT | 02.10.2003 | ES | 13.10.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/46] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
ES | 13.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
DK | 02.10.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
BE | 02.07.2003 | ||
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
CH | 02.07.2003 | ||
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
LI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 02.07.2003 | |
FI | 02.07.2003 | ||
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
GR | 02.10.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 02.07.2003 | |
NL | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 02.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1560943 (SAGER JAMES H) [A] 1-6 * figure - ** page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 19 *; | [A]US1998134 (GORMAN JOHN W, et al) [A] 1-10 * figure - * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 45 *; | [A]US2002832 (ROBINSON HAROLD H) [A] 1-10 * figure - * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 27 *; | [A]US2621066 (DARRIN HOWARD A) [A] 1-6 * figure - * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 60 * | by applicant | US2627437 | US5462324 |