EP0956579 - SWITCHING DEVICE WITH UNDER-VOLTAGE AUXILIARY RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREUTZER, Rainer In der Weiding 27a D-92637 Weiden / DE | [1999/46] | Application number, filing date | 98906834.1 | 22.01.1998 | [1999/46] | WO1998DE00201 | Priority number, date | DE1997103973 | 03.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19703973 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834260 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956579 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956579 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H83/12 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H01H83/12 (EP);
H01H3/40 (EP);
H01H71/46 (EP);
H01H71/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, IT [1999/46] | Title | German: | SCHALTGERÄT MIT UNTERSPANNUNGS-HILFSAUSLÖSER | [1999/46] | English: | SWITCHING DEVICE WITH UNDER-VOLTAGE AUXILIARY RELEASE | [1999/46] | French: | COMMUTATEUR A DECLENCHEUR AUXILIAIRE A MINIMUM DE TENSION | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4310863 (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4743876 (MILIANOWICZ STANISLAW A ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19526591 (ABB PATENT GMBH) | Examination | DE9206137U |