blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967885

EP0967885 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POURABLE METHIONINE SALT BASED ANIMAL FOOD SUPPLEMENT AND THE GRANULATE THUS OBTAINED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BINDER, Wolfram
Lerchenweg 2
D-63517 Rodenbach / DE
02 / HASSEBERG, Hans, Albrecht
Sommerbergstrasse 34
D-63584 Gründau / DE
03 / KNIESEL, Heidemarie
Franziskusstrasse 3
D-63768 Hösbach / DE
04 / KÖRFER, Martin
Waldstrasse 2 a
D-63867 Johannisberg / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98906899.431.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00515
Priority number, dateDE199710738025.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19707380
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9837772
Date:03.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967885
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967885
Date:20.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:A23K1/00, A23K1/16
[2000/01]
CPC:
A23K20/142 (EP,KR,US); A23K20/22 (KR); A23K20/24 (KR);
A23K40/10 (EP,KR,US); Y10S426/807 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES RIESELFÄHIGEN TIERFUTTERMITTELSUPPLEMENTS AUF METHIONINSALZBASIS UND DAS SO ERHÄLTLICHE GRANULAT[2000/01]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING POURABLE METHIONINE SALT BASED ANIMAL FOOD SUPPLEMENT AND THE GRANULATE THUS OBTAINED[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE COMPLEMENT ALIMENTAIRE COULANT POUR ANIMAUX, A BASE DE SEL DE METHIONINE ET GRANULAT OBTENU A L'AIDE DUDIT PROCEDE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase05.08.1999National basic fee paid 
05.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
23.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2001Fee for grant paid
07.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5615834  ;
 [A]JPH04244056  ;
 [A]ES8800009  ;
 [A]EP0556498  (ZINPRO CORP [US]) [A] 1,19 * example 5 * * claims 1,11 *;
 [PA]EP0809940  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [PA] 1* claims 1-12 *;
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 15, Database accession no. 81-26106D, XP002069060 & JPS5615834 A 00000000 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,6,8,19 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810425), vol. 5, no. 62, Database accession no. (C - 052), & JP56015834 A 19810216 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,6,8,19 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 41, Database accession no. 92-337741, XP002069061 & JPH04244056 A 00000000 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,19 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 09, Database accession no. 88-058362, XP002069062 & ES8800009 A 00000000 (NOREL SA) [A] 1,19 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.