EP0970198 - MICRO-ORGANISMS WITH INCREASED PRODUCTION OF CLAVULANIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/02] | NOVEL COMPOUNDS | ||
[2005/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE, LU | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | For all designated states The Governors of the University of Alberta Industry Liaison Office 222 Campus Towers, 8625 -112 Street Edmonton Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
For all designated states The Governors of the University of Alberta Industry Liaison Office, 222 Campus Towers, 8625 -112 Street Edmonton Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | |||
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham plc 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
For all designated states THE GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALBERTA Industry Liaison Office, 222 Campus Towers, 8625 -112 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | |||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | ||
For all designated states THE GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ALBERTA Industry Liaison Office, 222 Campus Towers, 8625 -112 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTON, Barry, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals Clarendon Road Worthing West Sussex BN14 8QH / GB | 02 /
GRIFFIN, John, Patrick, SmithKline Beecham Pharma. Clarendon Road Worthing West Sussex BN14 8QH / GB | 03 /
MOSHER, Roy, Henry, The Governors of Uni. Alberta 222 Campus Tower 8625-112 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | 04 /
PARADKAR, Ashish, Sudhakar, Uni. of Alberta 222 Campus Tower 8625-112 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | 05 /
JENSEN, Susan, The Governors of Uni. Alberta 222 Campus Tower 8625-112 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | 06 /
ANDERS, Cecilia, The University ofAlberta 222 Camfpus Tower 8625-112 Street Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Connell, Anthony Christopher GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Connell, Anthony Christopher SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98906924.0 | 02.02.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998EP00644 | Priority number, date | GB19970002218 | 04.02.1997 Original published format: GB 9702218 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9833896 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0970198 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970198 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12P17/18 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
C07K14/36 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C12N1/20 (KR);
C12N15/76 (EP,US);
C12P17/188 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Extension states | RO | 03.08.1999 | SI | 03.08.1999 | Title | German: | MIKROORGANISMEN MIT ERHÖHTER HERSTELLUNG VON CLAVULANSÄURE | [2000/02] | English: | MICRO-ORGANISMS WITH INCREASED PRODUCTION OF CLAVULANIC ACID | [2005/23] | French: | MICRO-ORGANISMES AVEC UNE PRODUCTION AUGMENTEE D'ACIDE CLAVULANIQUE | [2005/23] |
Former [2000/02] | NOVEL COMPOUNDS | ||
Former [2000/02] | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 04.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03078351.8 / EP1405913 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.12.2005 | CH | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | LI | 14.12.2005 | NL | 14.12.2005 | IE | 02.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | [2007/17] |
Former [2007/02] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.12.2005 | |
CH | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
LI | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]CA2108113 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA]) [Y] 1,6,9 * see the whole document and specially example 3 and figure 2 *; | [XDA] - E.N. MARSCH ET AL.,, "Two isozymes of clavaminate synthase central to clavulanic acid formation: cloning and sequencing of both genes from Streptomyces clavuligerus", BIOCHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1992), vol. 31, pages 12648 - 12657, XP002072686 [XD] 5 * see the whole document and specially figure 3 * [A] 1,2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00165a015 | [DY] - A.S. PARADKAR AND S.E. JENSEN, "Functional analysis of the gene encoding the clavaminate synthase 2 isoenzyme involved in clavulanic acid biosynthesis in Streptomyces clavuligerus", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1995), vol. 177, no. 5, pages 1307 - 1314, XP002072687 [DY] 1,6,9 * the whole document * | [YD] - K.A. AIDOO ET AL.,, "Cloning, sequencing and disruption of a gene from Streptomyces clavuligerus involved in clavulanic acid biosynthesis", GENE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1994), vol. 147, pages 41 - 46, XP002072688 [YD] 1,6,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90036-1 | [YA] - J.E. HODGSON ET AL.,, "Clavulanic acid biosynthesis in Streptomyces clavuligerus: gene cloning and characterization", GENE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), vol. 166, pages 49 - 55, XP002072689 [Y] 1 * see the whole document and specially figure 2 * [A] 2-4 | [A] - J.M. WARD AND J.E. HODGSON, "The biosynthetic genes for clavulanic acid and cephamycin production occur as a 'super-cluster' in three Streptomyces", FEMS MICROBIOLOGICAL LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1993), vol. 110, pages 239 - 242, XP000601357 [A] 1 * see the whole document and specially figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1097(93)90472-E | Examination | - J BIOL CHEM, vol. 270, pages 5399 - 5404 |