EP0960231 - LAUNDRY TREATING EQUIPMENT WITH A DRIVING MOTOR MOUNTED ON THE DRUM SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | ||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Miele & Cie. GmbH & Co. Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 D-33332 Gütersloh / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODE, Peter Gladiolenweg 4 D-53881 Euskirchen / DE | 02 /
HORSTMANN, Frank Michelsgraben 68 D-52391 Vettwei / DE | 03 /
SCHEIBNER, Helmut Franz-Sester-Strasse 11 D-53879 Euskirchen / DE | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/04] | Application number, filing date | 98906957.0 | 17.02.1998 | [1999/48] | WO1998EP00902 | Priority number, date | DE19971006184 | 17.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706184 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9836123 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0960231 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0960231 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0960231 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/30 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
D06F37/304 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/48] | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSGERÄT MIT EINEM AUF DER TROMMELWELLE ANGEORDNETEN ANTRIEBSMOTOR | [1999/48] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATING EQUIPMENT WITH A DRIVING MOTOR MOUNTED ON THE DRUM SHAFT | [1999/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LESSIVE AVEC UN MOTEUR D'ENTRAINEMENT MONTE SUR L'ARBRE DU TAMBOUR | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
27.07.2010
WITHDRAWN Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstr. 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | 02
17.02.2003
14.07.2010
WITHDRAWN BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Postfach 830101 81701 München / DE | [2010/36] |
Former [2010/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
17.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstr. 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
17.02.2003
14.07.2010
WITHDRAWN BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Postfach 830101 81701 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
17.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstr. 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
17.02.2003
10.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Postfach 830101 81701 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
17.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstr. 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
17.02.2003
10.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Postfach 100250 80076 München / DE | |||
Former [2005/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
17.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstr. 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
17.02.2003
10.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | |||
Former [2004/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
17.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Diehl Stiftung & Co. Stephanstr. 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
17.02.2003
10.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
17.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE Diehl Stiftung & Co Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nurnberg / DE Opponent's representative Führing, Dieter (DE) Diehl Stiftung & Co., Zentrale Patentabteilung, Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
17.02.2003
10.04.2003
ADMISSIBLE BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2003
Diehl Stiftung & Co Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nurnberg / DE Opponent's representative Führing, Dieter (DE) Diehl Stiftung & Co., Zentrale Patentabteilung, Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | 23.04.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.10.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.10.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.12.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 21.09.2004 | Appeal received No. T1126/04 | 02.12.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.10.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 19.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.08.2002 | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/23] | DK | 15.08.2002 | |
ES | 26.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | DK | 15.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2220681 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * page 21, line 5 - line 24 * * page 31, line 18 - page 49, line 5 * * figures 12-14,22-29 *; | [A]EP0410784 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0413915 (MULFINGEN ELEKTROBAU EBM [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]DE4335966 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0657575 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2295160 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5586455 (IMAI TOORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 33 - line 47 * * column 17, line 12 - column 18, line 14; figure 27 *; | [AP]WO9800902 (DOMEL ELEKTROMOTORJI IN GOSPOD [SI], et al) [AP] 1 * the whole document * | Opposition | DE1760382 | DE3319121 | DE3436470 | DE3819651 | EP0462826 | US5162709 | WO9405077 | US5448149 | NZ328233 | DE19749391 | - T. JACOBS, "Electronic motor speed control in automatic washing machines", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS, (1974), pages 191 - 197 | - B. MAURICE, "Digitale Steuerung eines Dreiphasen Induktionsmotors", DESIGN UND ELEKTRONIK, (1992), vol. 8, pages 40 - 46 | - UNTERSUCHUNGSBERICHT EINER WASCHMASCHINE DES TYPS FISHER & PAYKEL MW 051 | - MESSPROTOKOLL EINER WASCHMASCHINE DES TYPS FISHER & PAYKEL SMART DRIVE 708 | - VERKAUFSBELEGE EINER WASCHMASCHINE DES TYPS FISHER & PAYKEL MW 051 | - BELEGE UND SCHRIFTVERKEHR ZUM VERKAUF EINER WASCHMASCHINE DES TYPS FISHER & PAYKEL MW 051 UEBER EBAY |