EP0970995 - POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED RESIN, AND COATING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyowa Yuka Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Kyowa Yuka Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Shigeru 1-1-7, Nakaasahigaoka Suzuka-shi, Mie 510-0212 / JP | 02 /
YAMAUCHI, Toshio 1-11-2, Nakagawara Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0833 / JP | 03 /
FUJITANI, Ryoichi 1290, Yamashiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 512-8048 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98907213.7 | 13.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998JP01060 | Priority number, date | JP19970062576 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6257697 | [2000/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841578 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970995 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970995 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C09D167/00 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (KR);
C08G63/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08L79/00 (KR);
C09D167/00 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L61/20 (EP,US);
C09D167/00, C08L61/20 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/02] | C08L67/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | POLYESTERHARZ ZUSAMMENSETZUNG,GEHÄRTETES HARZ UND ÜBERZUGSMITTEL | [2000/02] | English: | POLYESTER RESIN COMPOSITION, CURED RESIN, AND COATING MATERIAL | [2000/02] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE POLYESTER, RESINE DURCIE ET MATERIAU DE REVETEMENT | [2000/02] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2000/02: Request for obvious corrections of the description has been filed | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1999 | Translation filed | 25.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2003 | CH | 07.05.2003 | FI | 07.05.2003 | IT | 07.05.2003 | LI | 07.05.2003 | DK | 07.08.2003 | GR | 07.08.2003 | PT | 07.08.2003 | SE | 07.08.2003 | ES | 18.08.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
CH | 07.05.2003 | ||
FI | 07.05.2003 | ||
LI | 07.05.2003 | ||
DK | 07.08.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
CH | 07.05.2003 | ||
FI | 07.05.2003 | ||
LI | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 07.05.2003 | |
CH | 07.05.2003 | ||
LI | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
ES | 18.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 07.05.2003 | |
LI | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 07.05.2003 | |
LI | 07.05.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 07.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4778830 (STREU JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [AD]EP0545108 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [AD] 1-7 * page 2, line 32 - line 34 * * page 7, line 13 - line 19 * * page 10, line 1 - line 13; claims 1-4; tables B,F *; | [X]EP0691388 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 9 - line 14 * * page 5, line 9 - line 14 * * example 7; table 8 *; | [X]EP0752456 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 56 - line 59; claims 1,6 * * page 3, lines 54-56 * * page 4, line 17 - line 49; example 1; table 1 * | International search | [A]JPH06287268 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JPH06287441 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JPH0782333 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM, et al); | [A]JPH0931172 (KYOWA YUKA KK); | [A]JPH0971668 (KASEI CO C I, et al); | [AE]JPH09255767 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) |