EP0963251 - FEEDING DEVICE FOR FIBROUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Fibertech AB 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [2000/42] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states SUNDS DEFIBRATOR INDUSTRIES AKTIEBOLAG 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIRVING, Nils Backtimjegränd 27 S-165 73 Hässelby / SE | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Sundqvist, Hans, et al Valmet Fibertech AB Patents Department 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Sundqvist, Hans, et al Valmet Fibertech AB Patents Department 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | ||
Former [1999/50] | Sundqvist, Hans Sunds Defibrator Industries Aktiebolag Patents Dept. Strandbergsgatan 61 112 51 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98907300.2 | 03.02.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998SE00184 | Priority number, date | SE19970000677 | 25.02.1997 Original published format: SE 9700677 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836837 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963251 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963251 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B02C7/12, D21B1/14, D21D1/30 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
D21B1/26 (EP,US);
B02C7/11 (EP,US);
D21D1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/50] | Title | German: | ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR FASERGUT | [1999/50] | English: | FEEDING DEVICE FOR FIBROUS MATERIAL | [1999/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN MATIERE FIBREUSE | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.09.2002 | SE | 18.12.2002 | GB | 03.02.2003 | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/48] | BE | 18.09.2002 | |
SE | 18.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 18.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1090937 (EIRICH WILHELM, et al) |