EP0963312 - ANCHORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roslagens Marincenter AB Bathamnsvägen 1 18440 Akersberga / SE | [2002/50] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states Roslagens Marincenter AB Bäthamnsvägen 1 18440 Akersberga / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALE, Olav Harneskvägen 1 S-184 60 Akersberga / SE | [2002/17] |
Former [1999/50] | 01 /
DALE, Olav Harneskvägen 1 S-184 60 kersberga / SE | Representative(s) | Säfwenberg, Björn, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Säfwenberg, Björn, et al Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98907321.8 | 27.02.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998SE00357 | Priority number, date | SE19970000710 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: SE 9700710 | [1999/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9838079 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963312 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963312 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/00 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
B63B21/30 (EP,US);
B63B21/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT [1999/50] | Title | German: | VERANKERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1999/50] | English: | ANCHORING DEVICE | [1999/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.12.2002 | PT | 11.03.2003 | [2003/51] |
Former [2003/29] | PT | 11.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP58139889 ; | [A]US3180304 (BRADY EDWARD L); | [A]US3516379 (SKOOG HAROLD A) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 257, (M-256); & JP,A,58 139 889 (GOYOU KENSETSU K.K.) 19 August 1983., & JP58139889 A 19830819 |