blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972056

EP0972056 - REAGENTS AND METHODS USEFUL FOR DETECTING DISEASES OF THE LUNG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BILLING-MEDEL, Patricia, A.
1427 Sherwood Court
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
02 / COHEN, Maurice
2026 Deerfield Road
Highland Park, IL 60035 / US
03 / COLPITTS, Tracey, L.
34365 North Circle Drive
Round Lake, IL 60073 / US
04 / FRIEDMAN, Paula, N.
462 Cumnor Court
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
05 / GORDON, Julian
307 East Sheridan Road
Lake Bluff, IL 60044 / US
06 / GRANADOS, Edward, N.
19 Montgomery Lane
Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US
07 / HODGES, Steven, C.
169 Stonegate Road
Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US
08 / KLASS, Michael, R.
1606 Mulberry Drive
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
09 / KRATOCHVIL, Jon, D.
7101 Fifth Avenue
Kenosha, WI 53143 / US
10 / ROBERTS-RAPP, Lisa
2090 Westfield Drive
Gurnee, IL 60031 / US
11 / RUSSELL, John, C.
8275 64th Court
Kenosha, WI 53142 / US
12 / STROUPE, Stephen, D.
945 Wilshire Drive
Libertyville, IL 60048 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98907345.730.01.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US01766
Priority number, dateUS1997079171031.01.1997         Original published format: US 791710
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9833926
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972056
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/63, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, C07K14/47, // C07K16/30, G01N33/574
[2000/03]
CPC:
C12Q1/6886 (EP); C12Q2600/136 (EP); C12Q2600/158 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:REAGENZIEN UND METHODEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON LUNGENKRANKHEITEN[2000/03]
English:REAGENTS AND METHODS USEFUL FOR DETECTING DISEASES OF THE LUNG[2000/03]
French:REACTIFS ET PROCEDES UTILES POUR DETECTER DES MALADIES DU POUMON[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase20.08.1999National basic fee paid 
20.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
09.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/02]
27.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9520681  (INCYTE PHARMA INC) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9630389  (MILLENIUM PHARM INC) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - HILLIER ET AL., "The WashU-Merck EST Project", EMBL, AC:N95182; ID:HSN95182, (19960419), XP002067183 [X] 1-16,30,33,35-37,39 * abstract *
 [X]  - HILLIER ET AL., "The WashU-Merck EST Project", EMBL, AC:W77934; ID:HS934359, (19960625), XP002067184 [X] 1-16,30,33,35-37,39 * abstract *
 [X]  - HILLIER ET AL., "The WashU-Merck EST Project", EMBL, AC:W76414; ID: HS414363, (19960623), XP002067185 [X] 1-16,30,33,35-37,39 * abstract *
 [A]  - SCHWARTZ M K, "CURRENT STATUS OF TUMOUR MARKERS", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL & LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (19950101), vol. 55, no. SUPPL. 221, pages 5 - 14, XP000490502 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - STRAUSBERG, "Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:1257654", EMBL, AC/ID: AA742697, (19980119), XP002067186 [PX] 1-16,30,33,35-37,39 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.