EP1005351 - AQUEOUS METAL BICARBONATE SOLUTIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/23] | AN AQUEOUS METAL BICARBONATE SOLUTION AND METHOD OF USE | ||
[2004/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lachlan Family Pty Ltd 1st Floor Chambers Corner London Circuit and University Avenue Canberra 2601 / AU | [2004/10] |
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states MacQuarie Veterinary Supplies PTY. Ltd. 4 Charlotte Street Red Hill, ACT 2603 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKETT, Russell, John 4 Charlotte Street Red Hill, ACT 2603 / AU | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Raynor, John, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98907760.7 | 16.03.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998AU00168 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO05677 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: AU PO567797 | AU1997PP00608 | 28.11.1997 Original published format: AU PP060897 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841218 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005351 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005351 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/10, A61K9/08, A61P29/00, A61P31/12 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/10 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/10, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/23] | A61K33/10, A61K9/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Extension states | AL | 12.10.1999 | LT | 12.10.1999 | LV | 12.10.1999 | MK | 12.10.1999 | RO | 12.10.1999 | SI | 12.10.1999 | Title | German: | WÄSSERIGE ALKALIMETALLBICARBONAT-LÖSUNGEN ZUR BENAHDLUNG VON OSTEOARTHROSE | [2004/06] | English: | AQUEOUS METAL BICARBONATE SOLUTIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS | [2004/06] | French: | SOLUTIONS AQUEUSES DE BICARBONATE DE METAL DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DE L'OSTEOARTHRITIS | [2004/06] |
Former [2000/23] | WÄSSERIGE ALKALIMETALLBICARBONAT-LÖSUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2000/23] | AN AQUEOUS METAL BICARBONATE SOLUTION AND METHOD OF USE | ||
Former [2000/23] | SOLUTION AQUEUSE DE BICARBONATE DE METAL ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 15.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04004350.7 / EP1447086 | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2004 | BE | 20.10.2004 | CH | 20.10.2004 | ES | 20.10.2004 | FI | 20.10.2004 | FR | 20.10.2004 | IT | 20.10.2004 | LI | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | GR | 20.01.2005 | SE | 20.01.2005 | DE | 21.01.2005 | IE | 16.03.2005 | LU | 16.03.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
ES | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
LU | 16.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
ES | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
FR | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
BE | 20.10.2004 | ||
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
CH | 20.10.2004 | ||
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
LI | 20.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4588744 (MCHUGH JOHN E [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 16 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 21 * * examples I-VII * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO8906133 (COMMIN ALIX ROLAND [FR]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1 ** claims 1-9 * | International search | [X]GB1453616 (CYBERSOL); | [X]US4489535 (VELTMAN PRESTON L [US]); | [X]AU3779885 (WEBB WARING LUNG INST); | [X]US4663166 (VEECH RICHARD L [US]); | [X]WO9110457 (NEPHRO MEDICA PHARMA [DE]); | [X]AU2995892 (ALCON LAB INC); | [X]US5296242 (ZANDER ROLF [DE]); | [X]AU7746694 (VEECH RICHARD L); | [X]US5409904 (HECHT GERALD [US], et al); | [X]WO9600055 (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | [X]WO9610409 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) |