EP0956539 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CODING AND DECODING A DIGITIZED IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUP, Andre Brotmannstrasse 25 D-85635 Höhenkirchen / DE | [1999/46] | Application number, filing date | 98907825.8 | 19.01.1998 | [1999/46] | WO1998DE00156 | Priority number, date | DE1997103670 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19703670 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834196 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956539 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956539 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00, H04N7/30 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H04N19/649 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR CODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG EINES DIGITALISIERTEN BILDES | [1999/46] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CODING AND DECODING A DIGITIZED IMAGE | [1999/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE ET DE DECODAGE D'UNE IMAGE NUMERISEE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0530022 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | [YA] - SIKORA T ET AL, "SHAPE-ADAPTIVE DCT FOR GENERIC CODING OF VIDEO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (19950201), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 59 - 62, XP000488410 [Y] 1,2,5-7,10,11 * page 60, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 62, column 2 * [A] 3,4,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.350781 | [Y] - RAO K R ET AL, "IMAGE CODING", DISCRETE COSINE TRANSFORM, ALGORITHMS, ADVANTAGES, APPLICATIONS, RAO K R;YIP P, (19900101), pages 163 - 207, XP000379255 [Y] 1,2,5-7,10,11 * page 169 - page 171, line 1 * |