EP0967882 - AROMATIZATION OF BEVERAGE POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Service des Brevets Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Service des Brevets Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSHMORE, Dean, Frederick 17735 Brown School Road Marysville, OH 43040 / US | 02 /
CARNS, Lawrence, G. 9667 Monterey Drive Plain City, OH 43064 / US | [2000/01] | Application number, filing date | 98907982.7 | 13.01.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998EP00379 | Priority number, date | US19970790134 | 29.01.1997 Original published format: US 790134 | US19970960131 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: US 960131 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9832339 | Date: | 30.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967882 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967882 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/48, A23F5/46, A23L1/22 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A23F5/48 (EP,KR);
A23F5/465 (EP,KR);
A23L2/38 (KR);
A23L2/56 (EP,KR);
A23L27/70 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | AROMATISIERUNG VON GETRÄNKEPULVERN | [2000/01] | English: | AROMATIZATION OF BEVERAGE POWDERS | [2000/01] | French: | AROMATISATION DE POUDRES POUR BOISSONS | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3077405 (CLINTON WILLIAM P, et al) [A] 1-4,8,9 * column 5; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]US3148070 (MISHKIN ABRAHAM R, et al) [AD] 1,8,9 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 61; figures 1,2; example 3 *; | [A]US3873745 (REY LOUIS, et al) [A] 1,8 * example 2 *; | [AD]US4355571 (STOECKLI OSCAR W, et al); | [A]US4475849 (HILGRAF PETER [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3931094 (INST GETREIDEVERARBEITUNG [DD]) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9623423 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,8,9 * page 8, line 35 - page 9, line 9; claims 1,8 * |