blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972075

EP0972075 - METHODS FOR ASSESSING CARDIOVASCULAR STATUS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meadowland Business Partners AB
St Mikael Hotel, 2 floor Fridhemsgatan 15
792 24 Mora / SE
[2006/19]
Former [2004/40]For all designated states
Biotage AB
Kungsgatan 76
753 18 Uppsala / SE
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Pyrosequencing AB
Vallongatan 1
752 28 Uppsala / SE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Eurona Medical AB
Kungsangsvagen 29, P.O. Box 398
751 06 Uppsala / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NORBERG, Leif, Torbjörn
Backvägen 14 B
S-756 52 Uppsala / SE
02 / ANDERSSON, Maria, Kristina
Backvägen 14 B
S-756 52 Uppsala / SE
03 / LINDSTRÖM, Per, Harry, Rutger
Svankkärsvägen 26 A
S-756 53 Uppsala / SE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2000/03]Hall, Marina, et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date98908252.401.04.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998IB00475
Priority number, dateUS19970042930P04.04.1997         Original published format: US 42930 P
[2006/32]
Former [2000/03]US19970004293P04.04.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9845477
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972075
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972075
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68, C07K14/72, C07K14/575, C12N9/48
[2000/03]
CPC:
C12N9/48 (EP,US); A61P9/02 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP); C12Q1/6883 (EP,US); C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES KARDIOVASCULÄREN STATUS UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG[2000/03]
English:METHODS FOR ASSESSING CARDIOVASCULAR STATUS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE THEREOF[2000/03]
French:PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'EVALUER UN ETAT CARDIOVASCULAIRE, ET COMPOSITIONS UTILES A CET EFFET[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
16.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
26.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
25.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.05.2006Fee for grant paid
Opposition(s)10.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29]
Request for further processing for:26.05.2006Request for further processing filed
26.05.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.06.2006Decision despatched
27.04.2005Request for further processing filed
27.04.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.05.2005Decision despatched
26.03.2004Request for further processing filed
26.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9300360  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]) [X] 1-3,10,12,15,17 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - line 18 * * page 4, line 23 - line 30 * * page 7, line 6 - line 12 * [A] 16;
 [XA]WO9408048  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13,34 * page 5, line 5 - line 23 * * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 4 * * page 12, line 1 - line 30 * [A] 6-8,18-20;
 [XA]WO9605324  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,12,14,34 * abstract * * page 9, line 18 - line 27 * [A] 8,9,15-17,21-23;
 [DXA]  - TIRET L ET AL, "SYNERGISTIC EFFECT OF ANGIOTENSIN-CONVERTING ENZYME AND ANGIOTENSIN-II TYPE 1 RECEPTOR GENE POLYMORPHISMS ON RISK OF MYOCARDIAL INFARCTION", LANCET THE, (19941001), vol. 344, pages 910 - 913, XP000619739 [DX] 1-5 * abstract * * page 910, column R * * page 912, column R - page 913, column L * [A] 6,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(94)92268-3
Examination   - BENSON ET AL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, pages D23 - D26
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.