blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968458

EP0968458 - OPTICAL PROXIMITY CORRECTION METHOD FOR INTERMEDIATE-PITCH FEATURES USING SUB-RESOLUTION SCATTERING BARS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASML MaskTools B.V.
De Run 6501
5504 DR Veldhoven / NL
[2004/39]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
ASML Masktools B.V.
De Run 1110
5503 LA Veldhoven / NL
Former [2002/27]For all designated states
ASML Masktools Netherlands B.V.
De Run 1110
5503 LA Veldhoven / NL
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
ASM LITHOGRAPHY HOLDING N.V.
De Run 1110
5503 LA Veldhoven / NL
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
ASM LITHOGRAPHY B.V.
De Run 1110
5503 LA Veldhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Jang, Fung
11752 Pine Brook Lane
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / WAMPLER, Kurt, E.
1098 Cascade Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
03 / LAIDIG, Thomas, L.
201 Cottage Avenue
Pt. Richmond, CA 94801 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)van den Hooven, Jan, et al
ASML Netherlands B.V.
Corporate Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/14]Van den Hooven, Jan, et al
ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
Former [2002/27]Leeming, John Gerard, et al
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/01]DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER
Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date98908466.020.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US02100
Priority number, dateUS1997080858728.02.1997         Original published format: US 808587
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9838549
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968458
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968458
Date:23.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:G03C5/00, G03F9/00, G03F1/14
[2001/18]
CPC:
G03F7/70125 (EP,US); G03F9/00 (KR); G03F1/36 (EP,US);
G03F7/70441 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/01]G03C5/00, G03F9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:KORREKTUR DES PROXIMITY EFFEKTS (NAHEFFEKTS) BEI MUSTERN MIT MITTLEREM ABSTAND MITTELS NICHT AUFGELÖSTER HILFSSTRUKTUREN[2008/07]
English:OPTICAL PROXIMITY CORRECTION METHOD FOR INTERMEDIATE-PITCH FEATURES USING SUB-RESOLUTION SCATTERING BARS[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE CORRECTION DE LA PROXIMITE OPTIQUE D'ENTITES A PAS INTERMEDIAIRE A L'AIDE DE BARRES DE DIFFRACTION INFRA-RESOLUTION[2008/07]
Former [2000/01]KORREKTUR DES PROXIMITY EFFEKTS (NAHEFFEKTS) BEI MUSTERN MIT MITTLEREN ABSTAND MITTELS NICHT AUFGELÖSTER HILFSSTRUKTUREN
Former [2000/01]PROCEDE DE CORRECTION DE LA PROXIMITE OPTIQUE D'ENTITES A PAS INTERMEDIAIRE A L'AIDE DE BARRES DE DIFFUSION INFRA-RESOLUTION
Entry into regional phase28.09.1999National basic fee paid 
28.09.1999Search fee paid 
28.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
28.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.01.2008
10.01.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.01.2008Date of oral proceedings
24.01.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2008Fee for grant paid
05.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
08.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
14.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT20.02.2009
[2011/28]
Documents cited:Search[X]US5439765  (NOZUE HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,8,16 * column 3, line 43 - line 68; figure 7; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2291982  (HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS IND [KR]) [A] 1,8,16 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US5496666  (CHU RON-FU [SG], et al) [A] 1,8,16 * claims 1-20 *;
 [X]US5587834  (NOGUCHI MIYOKO [JP]) [X] 1,8,16 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]  - OTTO O W, KOSTELAK R L. VAIDYA S, VASUDEV P K, "Automated optical proximity correction - a rules based approach", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, San Jose USA, (19940302), vol. 2197, pages 278 - 293, XP000989989 [A] 1,8,16 * page 278, paragraph 1 - page 292, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.175422
International search[A]US5242770  (CHEN JANG F [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.