EP0961764 - PRODUCTION OF ALKYL ARALKYL KETONES FROM ALLYLIC-ARALKENYL SECONDARY ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1780 / US | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELMONT, Stephen E. Apartment B, 215 Ship Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70806 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98908561.8 | 18.02.1998 | [1999/49] | WO1998US02950 | Priority number, date | US19970804528 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: US 804528 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837048 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961764 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/51, C07C49/255, C07C29/32 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
C07C29/32 (EP,US);
C07C45/512 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/32, C07C33/03 (US,EP);
C07C45/512, C07C49/255 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKYL ARALKYL KETONEN AUS SEKUNDÄREN ALLYL-ARALKENYL ALKOHOLEN | [1999/49] | English: | PRODUCTION OF ALKYL ARALKYL KETONES FROM ALLYLIC-ARALKENYL SECONDARY ALCOHOLS | [1999/49] | French: | PRODUCTION DE CETONES D'ALKYL-ARALKYLE A PARTIR D'ALCOOLS SECONDAIRES D'ARALKENYLE ALLYLIQUE | [1999/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/45] | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3344191 (CHAPPELL STERLING F, et al) [X] 1-14 * column W *; | [A]EP0376516 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [A] 15 * claim - *; | [A]CH676237 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC) [A] 15* claim - *; | [A] - ASLAM M ET AL, "Convenient syntheses of nabumetone", SYNTHESIS (SYNTBF,00397881);89; (11); PP.869-70, HOECHST CELANESE CORP.;CORPUS CHRISTI TECH. CENT.; CORPUS CHRISTI; 78409; TX; USA (US), XP000081380 [A] 15-19 * page 869 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1989-27417 |