EP0980364 - Process for preparing coumarin sulphonates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/08] | PROCESS FOR PREPARING COUMARIN SULFONATES | ||
[2002/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2000/16] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASLAM, Mohammad 15 Revere Ave. Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
SHEEHAN, Michael, T. 6145 Tarafaya Drive Corpus Christi, TX 78414-6136 / US | 03 /
KVAKOVSZKY, George 3068 Meadow Lake Drive East Slidell, Louisiana 70461 / US | [2000/17] |
Former [2000/14] | 01 /
ASLAM, Mohammad 15 Revere Ave. Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | ||
02 /
SHEEHAN, Michael, T. 6145 Tarafaya Drive Corpus Christi, TX 78414-6136 / US | |||
03 /
KVAKOVSZKY, George 536 Naples Corpus Christi, TX 78404 / US | |||
Former [2000/13] | 01 /
ASLAM, Mohammad 7221 Diamond Ridge Corpus Christi, TX 78413 / US | ||
02 /
SHEEHAN, Michael, T. 6145 Tarafaya Drive Corpus Christi, TX 78414-6136 / US | |||
03 /
KVAKOVSZKY, George 536 Naples Corpus Christi, TX 78404 / US | |||
Former [2000/08] | 01 /
ASLAM, Mohammad 7221 Diamond Ridge Corpus Christi, TX 78413 / US | ||
02 /
SHEEHAN, Michael, T. 3117 Briarhurst Corpus Christi, TX 78414 / US | |||
03 /
KVAKOVSZKY, George 536 Naples Corpus Christi, TX 78404 / US | Representative(s) | Hütter, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Hütter, Klaus, Dr., et al Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 98908652.5 | 23.02.1998 | [2000/08] | WO1998US03448 | Priority number, date | US19970813106 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: US 813106 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9839318 | Date: | 11.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980364 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980364 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/56, C07D335/06 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
C07D311/56 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Coumarinsulfonaten | [2002/51] | English: | Process for preparing coumarin sulphonates | [2002/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation de sulfonates de coumarine | [2002/51] |
Former [2000/08] | BESCHICHTUNGS-, KLEBE- UND DICHTMITTEL ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | ||
Former [2000/08] | PROCESS FOR PREPARING COUMARIN SULFONATES | ||
Former [2000/08] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SULFONATES DE COUMARINE | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPH0261640 [ ] (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AP] - C.G.WILSON ET AL., "NON-CHEMICALLY AMPLIFIED 248NM RESIST MATERIALS.", PROC.SPIE-INT.SOC.OPT.ENG., USA, (19970310), vol. 3049, pages 226 - 237, XP002066509 [AP] 1 * page 226 - page 233 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.275821 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1990), vol. 113, no. 74, Database accession no. 68407v, page 621, XP002066511 [A] * abstract * |