EP1008037 - INSTRUCTION COMPRESSION AND DECOMPRESSION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tamiras Per Pte. Ltd., LLC 160 Greentree Drive, Suite 101 Dover, DE 19904 / US | [2010/15] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Genesis Microchip, Inc. 2150 Gold Street Alviso, CA 95002 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states VM Labs, Inc 167 So. San Antonio road No.17 Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Richard, G. 25055 La Loma Drive Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
CARDILLO, Louis, A. 59 Roosevelt Circle Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
MATHIESON, John, G. 23583 Skyview Terrace Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Eric, R. 450 N. Mathilda Avenue C204 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98908805.9 | 27.02.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US03954 | Priority number, date | US19970808735 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: US 808735 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9838791 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008037 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38, G06F9/30, G06F9/318 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
G06F9/3802 (EP,US);
G06F5/00 (KR);
G06F9/30156 (EP,US);
G06F9/30167 (EP,US);
G06F9/30178 (EP,US);
G06F9/3853 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFEHLSKOMPRESSION UND DEKOMPRESSION FÜR EINEN PROZESSOR | [2000/24] | English: | INSTRUCTION COMPRESSION AND DECOMPRESSION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A PROCESSOR | [2000/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMPRESSION ET DECOMPRESSION DE DONNEES POUR UNITE CENTRALE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.04.2001 | 29.02.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2004 | 28.02.2015 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0463299 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2,6,12,13,17,23-25,28,30,33,34 * abstract * * column 7, line 19 - line 56 * * column 10, line 9 - line 37 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0652509 (INTERGRAPH CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4,5,11-13,15,22-24,26,28,29,31,33,34 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9743710 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,6,11-13,15,17,22-26,28-30,33,34 * the whole document *; | [PA]JPH1011289 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [PA] 3,14; | US5848255 [ ] (KONDO YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [ ] * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 26 *; | [X] - CONTE T M ET AL, "Instruction fetch mechanisms for VLIW architectures with compressed encodings", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 29TH. ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE. MICRO-29. PARIS, DEC. 2 - 4, 1996, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MICROARCHITECTURE. (MICRO), LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, U, (19961202), vol. SYMP. 29, ISBN 0-8186-7641-8, pages 201 - 211, XP010206097 [X] 1,2,4,6,11-13,15,17,22-26,28-30,33,34 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MICRO.1996.566462 | International search | [A]US5057837 (COLWELL ROBERT P [US], et al) |