blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968400

EP0968400 - TOPOLOGICAL AND MOTION MEASURING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANADIAN SPACE AGENCY
6767 Route de l'Aéroport Saint-Hubert
Quebec J3Y 8Y9 / CA
[2007/19]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
CANADIAN SPACE AGENCY
6767 Route de l'Aéroport
Saint-Hubert, Quebec J3Y 8Y9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / DANISCH, Lee
Measurand Inc., P.O. box 21029
Fredericton, New Brunswick E3B 7A3 / CA
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Newell, William Joseph
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP
Essex Place
22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Newell, William Joseph
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Application number, filing date98909255.617.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998CA00213
Priority number, dateCA1997220011717.03.1997         Original published format: CA 2200117
US1997086306323.05.1997         Original published format: US 863063
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9841815
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968400
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968400
Date:09.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:G01B21/04, G06F3/00, G01B11/16
[2000/01]
CPC:
G06F3/011 (EP); G01B11/18 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:TOPOLOGIE- UND BEWEGUNGSMESSINSTRUMENT[2000/01]
English:TOPOLOGICAL AND MOTION MEASURING TOOL[2000/01]
French:INSTRUMENT SERVANT A MESURER LA TOPOLOGIE ET LE MOUVEMENT[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
08.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2007Fee for grant paid
21.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT09.05.2007
[2008/23]
Cited inInternational search[A]US4570065  (PRYOR TIMOTHY R [CA]);
 [A]EP0344322  (TSNI GEOLOGORAZVEDOCHNY I TSVE [SU]);
 [XY]GB2238112  (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]);
 [A]DE4240531  (HOFMANN FRANK [DE], et al);
 [Y]EP0615110  (INST FERTIGUNGSTECHNIK DER TU [AT]);
 [AD]WO9429671  (DANISCH LEE A [CA])
by applicantEP0344322
 DE4240531
 US5321257
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.