EP0972136 - CENTRIFUGAL LIQUID PUMP WITH INTERNAL GAS INJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Les Traitements des Eaux Poseidon Inc. 810 Champagneur Outremont Quebec H2V 4S3 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states Les Traitements des Eaux Poseidon Inc. 810 Champagneur Outremont, Quebec H2V 4S3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFOUR, Reneau 42 Place Bonair Breakeyville, Quebec G0S 1E1 / CA | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98909256.4 | 12.03.1998 | [2000/03] | WO1998CA00219 | Priority number, date | US19970837326 | 11.04.1997 Original published format: US 837326 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846887 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972136 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972136 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04D7/04, F04D29/22, F04D31/00 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
F04D7/045 (EP,US);
F04D29/2277 (EP,US);
F04D31/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | KREISELFLÜSSIGKEITSPUMPE MIT INTERNER GASINJEKTION | [2000/03] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL LIQUID PUMP WITH INTERNAL GAS INJECTION | [2000/03] | French: | POMPE A LIQUIDE CENTRIFUGE AVEC INJECTION DE GAZ INTERNE | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.11.2002 | CH | 20.11.2002 | FI | 20.11.2002 | GR | 20.11.2002 | LI | 20.11.2002 | NL | 20.11.2002 | DK | 20.02.2003 | PT | 20.02.2003 | IE | 12.03.2003 | LU | 12.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/02] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
CH | 20.11.2002 | ||
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
LU | 12.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
CH | 20.11.2002 | ||
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
LU | 12.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
CH | 20.11.2002 | ||
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | BE | 20.11.2002 | |
CH | 20.11.2002 | ||
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 20.11.2002 | |
FI | 20.11.2002 | ||
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | CH | 20.11.2002 | |
GR | 20.11.2002 | ||
LI | 20.11.2002 | ||
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 20.11.2002 | |
NL | 20.11.2002 | ||
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 20.11.2002 | |
PT | 20.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 20.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3217655 (ALBERT SERCY MICHEL, et al) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 17 - line 62; figures 5,6A *; | [A]US3663117 (WARREN CLINTON C) [A] 1,6* column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2129138 (TRAILIGAZ) [A] 1,5,6 * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 16; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]US5385443 (DUFOUR RENEAU [CA]) [AD] 1-3,6 * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 51; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9713071 (RAY ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 5; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | FR853227 | US3485484 | CA1016408 | US4335996 | US4514139 | US4744722 | US4768920 | US4773819 | US4940385 | US5385443 |