EP0968213 - ALKYNYL-SUBSTITUTED CAMPTOTHECINS AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Italia S.p.A. Via Robert Koch 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | [2002/15] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn S.p.A. Niale Pasteur, 10 20014 Nerviano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANDIANI, Ilaria Via del Chisso, 10 I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | 02 /
BEDESCHI, Angelo Via Redaelli, 11 I-20146 Milano / IT | 03 /
VISENTIN, Giuseppina Via Treviso, 3 I-20117 Rho / IT | 04 /
FAGNOLA, Maria, Chiara Via C. Coppellotti, 4 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | 05 /
CAPOLONGO, Laura Via P. Rembrandt, 11 I-20147 Milano / IT | [2000/01] | Application number, filing date | 98909400.8 | 04.02.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998EP00649 | Priority number, date | GB19970002807 | 12.02.1997 Original published format: GB 9702807 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9835969 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968213 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968213 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/22, A61K31/44, // (C07D491/22, 311:00, 221:00, 221:00, 209:00) | [2000/01] | CPC: |
C07D491/22 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | DURCH ALKYNYL SUBSTITUIERTE CAMPTOTHECTINE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2000/01] | English: | ALKYNYL-SUBSTITUTED CAMPTOTHECINS AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [2000/01] | French: | CAMPTOTHECINES A SUBSTITUTION ALKYNYL ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9637496 (PHARMACIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,6* claims 1,6 * |