blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971804

EP0971804 - METHOD AND APPARATUS AVOIDING CONTACT BETWEEN OXYGEN AND MOLTEN METAL DURING CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]HOW TO AVOID CONTACT BETWEEN OXYGEN AND MOLTEN METAL
[2001/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOEST-ALPINE Industrieanlagenbau GmbH
Turmstrasse 44
4020 Linz / AT
For all designated states
Acciai Speciali Terni S.p.A.
Viale Benedetto Brin n. 218
05100 Terni / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH
Turmstrasse 44
4020 Linz / AT
For all designated states
Acciai Speciali Terni S.p.A.
Viale Benedetto Brin n. 218
05100 Terni / IT
Inventor(s)01 / HOHENBICHLER, Gerald
Severinusstrasse 11/7
A-4470 Enns / AT
02 / PELLISSETTI, Stefano
Griesmayrstrasse 19/7
A-4040 Linz / AT
03 / CAPOTOSTI, Romeo
Strada delle Grazie, 10
I-05020 Narni / IT
04 / TONELLI, Riccardo
Via dei Valeri, 8
I-00184 Roma / IT
[2000/03]
Representative(s)VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co
Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 2
4020 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]VA TECH Patente GmbH
Stahlstrasse 21 a
4020 Linz / AT
Former [2001/12]VA TECH Patente GmbH
Serravagasse 10
1140 Wien / AT
Former [2000/03]Rieberer, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing.
VA TECH Patente GmbH, Stahlstrasse 21a
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date98909453.712.02.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998EP00787
Priority number, dateIT1997RM0007814.02.1997         Original published format: IT RM970078
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9835772
Date:20.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971804
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971804
Date:24.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:B22D11/06
[2000/03]
CPC:
B22D11/0697 (EP,US); B22D11/0622 (KR); B22D11/0642 (KR);
B22D11/12 (KR); B22D27/003 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERHINDERN DES KONTAKTES VON SAUERSTOFF MIT EINER METALLSCHMELZE BEIM GIESSEN[2001/09]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS AVOIDING CONTACT BETWEEN OXYGEN AND MOLTEN METAL DURING CASTING[2001/09]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR EVITER LE CONTACT ENTRE OXYGENE ET METAL EN FUSION[2001/09]
Former [2000/03]VERFAHREN ZUM VERHINDERN DES KONTAKTES VON SAUERSTOFF MIT EINER METALLSCHMELZE
Former [2000/03]HOW TO AVOID CONTACT BETWEEN OXYGEN AND MOLTEN METAL
Former [2000/03]PROCEDE POUR EVITER LE CONTACT ENTRE OXYGENE ET METAL EN FUSION
Entry into regional phase11.06.1999National basic fee paid 
11.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
26.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2001Fee for grant paid
07.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchJPH04300049  [ ];
 JPS59166356  [ ];
 [AD]EP0040072  (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION) [AD] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS59166356  (HITACHI SEISEN KK) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]DE3602594  (SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN [DE]) [AD] 1,17 * figure 6; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]WO8706166  (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1,17 * figure 2; claim 8 *;
 [A]EP0409645  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]US4987949  (SAKAGUCHI HARUO [JP], et al) [AD] 1,17 * column 6, lines 7-12; figures 2,3; claim 1 *;
 [X]JPH04300049  (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [X] 1,17 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0523643  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 5 *;
 [AD]EP0526886  (OLIN CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0430841  (USINOR SACILOR SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME) [AD] 1,17 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0568211  (ALLEGHENY LUDLUM CORP [US]) [AD] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [AD]EP0714716  (USINOR SACILOR [FR], et al) [AD] 1,17 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930309), vol. 017, no. 114, Database accession no. (M - 1377), & JP04300049 A 19921023 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP) [ ] * abstract *
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850125), vol. 009, no. 018, Database accession no. (M - 353), & JP59166356 A 19840919 (HITACHI SEISEN KK) [ ] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.