EP0973505 - AQUEOUS PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT WHICH IS HIGHLY INSOLUBLE IN WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AZIENDE CHIMICHE RIUNITE ANGELINI FRANCESCO - A.C.R.A.F. - S.p.A. Viale Amelia, 70 00181 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states AZIENDE CHIMICHE RIUNITE ANGELINI FRANCESCO - A.C.R.A.F. - S.p.A. Viale Amelia, 70 00181 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAVALLO, Giovanni Via delle Tartane, 45 I-00122 Ostia / IT | 02 /
MARCHITTO, Leonardo Via S. Margherita, 2 I-63012 Cupra Marittima / IT | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Marchi, Massimo, Dr., et al Marchi & Partners, Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98909460.2 | 12.02.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998EP00816 | Priority number, date | IT1997MI00363 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: IT MI970363 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836735 | Date: | 27.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973505 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0973505 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/1277 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,KR,US);
A61P15/08 (EP);
Y10S977/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Extension states | LV | 08.09.1999 | RO | 08.09.1999 | SI | 08.09.1999 | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGES ARZNEIMITTEL, DAS EINEN IN WASSER SEHR SCHWERLÖSLICHEN AKTIVBESTANDTEIL ENTHÄLT | [2000/04] | English: | AQUEOUS PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT WHICH IS HIGHLY INSOLUBLE IN WATER | [2000/04] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE AQUEUSE COMPRENANT UN PRINCIPE ACTIF ESSENTIELLEMENT INSOLUBLE DANS L'EAU | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 24.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Request for further processing for: | 30.04.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE4038075 (B. BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 30 * * claims 11,13 * [A] 7-15; | [X]EP0578620 (I F L O S A S DI GIORGIO E ALD [IT]) [X] 1,2 * claim 18 *; | [A]EP0671156 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [A] 7-14* page 10; example 3 *; | [A]DE4430593 (MAX DELBRUECK CENTRUM [DE]) [A] 7-14 * page 3, line 17 - line 53 * * claim 14 *; | [X]WO9640064 (NEXSTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 1 - page 10, line 2 * |