Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001517391 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FI9800225 | 13.03.1998 | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU741822B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2001 | B2 | AU6402898 | 12.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FI9800225 | 13.03.1998 | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0968571 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2009 | B1 | EP0968571 | 05.01.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI9800225 | 13.03.1998 | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69840540D1 | 26.03.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FI9800225 | 13.03.1998 | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO994494L | 16.09.1999 | L | NO994494D0 | 16.09.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | FI9800225 | 13.03.1998 | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6799021 | 28.09.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FI9800225 | 13.03.1998 | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9842082 | Global Dossier | 03.12.1998 | A3 | WO9842082 | 24.09.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE422733T | 15.02.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1251228 | 19.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI103306B | 31.05.1999 | B1 | FI103306B | 31.05.1999 | B | FI971121 | 18.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | FI971121 | 17.03.1997 |