EP0968571 - Method and arrangement for forming an address for corrector table employed in signal predistortion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/01] | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FORMING AN ADDRESS | ||
[2008/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, IT, LU | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/08] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAPIO, Olli Kumputie 33 as. 8 FIN-90940 Jääli / FI | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Karppinen, Olavi Arto, et al Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Karppinen, Olavi Arto, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2000/01] | Pakanen, Henrik Jorma, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98909524.5 | 13.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998FI00225 | Priority number, date | FI19970001121 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: FI 971121 | [2000/01] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9842082 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0968571 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968571 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/62 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
H04B1/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Adressenbildung für eine Korrekturtabelle zum Einsatz in Signalvorverzerrung | [2008/39] | English: | Method and arrangement for forming an address for corrector table employed in signal predistortion | [2008/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de formation d'adresse pour un barème de correction employé dans prédistorsion de signaux | [2008/39] |
Former [2000/01] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ADRESSENBILDUNG | ||
Former [2000/01] | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FORMING AN ADDRESS | ||
Former [2000/01] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'ADRESSE | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1998 | Translation filed | 10.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 27.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2009 | BE | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IT | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | IE | 13.03.2009 | LU | 13.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | DE | 01.10.2009 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/19] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 13.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
DE | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 13.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP08251246 ; | [X]EP0240055 (AT & T & PHILIPS TELECOMM [NL]); | [AP]WO9749174 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN; & JP,A,08 251 246 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) 27 Sept. 1996., & JP08251246 A 00000000 | Examination | US4462001 |