blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971061

EP0971061 - SEWING SYSTEM AND SEWING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hashimoto, Yoshiko
31-1, Aza Sakanoue, Oaza Nishikawa Sukagawa-shi
Fukushima 962-0052 / JP
For all designated states
Furudate, Akira
355-1, Aza Yarouchi, Oaza Wada Sukagawa-shi
Fukushima 962-0813 / JP
For all designated states
Furudate, Hiroshi
75-5, Aza Takenohana, Oaza Kosakuda Sukagawa-shi
Fukushima 962-0727 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Hashimoto, Yoshiko
31-1, Aza Sakanoue, Oaza Nishikawa
Sukagawa-shi, Fukushima 962-0052 / JP
For all designated states
Furudate, Akira
355-1, Aza Yarouchi, Oaza Wada
Sukagawa-shi, Fukushima 962-0813 / JP
For all designated states
Furudate, Hiroshi
75-5, Aza Takenohana, Oaza Kosakuda
Sukagawa-shi, Fukushima 962-0727 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FURUDATE, Hiroshi
75-5, Aza Takenohana, Oaza Kosakuda
Sukagawa-shi, Fukushima 962-0727 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date98909805.823.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP01227
Priority number, dateJP1997008881424.03.1997         Original published format: JP 8881497
JP1997031153727.10.1997         Original published format: JP 31153797
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842906
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971061
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:D05B7/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
D05B7/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:NÄHVERFAHREN UND - VORRICHTUNG[2000/02]
English:SEWING SYSTEM AND SEWING METHOD[2000/02]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COUTURE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase09.09.1999Translation filed 
09.09.1999National basic fee paid 
14.10.1999Search fee paid 
09.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
02.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/12]
18.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPS63160692  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [AP]JPH0999187  (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH08266758  (TOKYO METROPOLITAN GOV);
 [A]JPH0681253  (SHIMA SEIKI MFG);
 [A]JPH05305189  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.