EP0964628 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRIMMING AND END-ROUNDING BRISTLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILLETTE CANADA COMPANY 4 Robert Speck Parkway Mississauga Ontario L4Z 4C5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states GILLETTE CANADA COMPANY 4 Robert Speck Parkway Mississauga, Ontario L4Z 4C5 / CA | ||
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states GILLETTE CANADA INC. 16700 Trans Canada Kirkland, Quebec H9H 4Y8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILIPP, John, K. 801 Country Club Drive Lisbon, IA 52253 / US | 02 /
MEESSMANN, Jeffrey, S. 952 Pepper Drive Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | 03 /
GORANSON, James, A. P.O. Box 2056 Iowa City, IA 52244 / US | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/34] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/51] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98910173.8 | 02.03.1998 | [1999/51] | WO1998US04261 | Priority number, date | US19970807717 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: US 807717 | [1999/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844824 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964628 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964628 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A46D1/05, A46D1/06, A46D9/02 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
A46D9/02 (EP,US);
A46D1/05 (EP,US);
A46D1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN UND ABRUNDEN VON BORSTENENDEN | [1999/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRIMMING AND END-ROUNDING BRISTLES | [1999/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A TAILLER DES SOIES ET A ARRONDIR LEURS EXTREMITES | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.01.2002 | IT | 30.01.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 30.01.2002 | |
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE9107687U (FA. ZAHORANSKY); | [Y]US5431484 (ZAHORANSKY HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4-14,18,21,23,24 * column 3, line 45 - column 6, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE19525808 (ZAHORANSKY ANTON GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,4-14,18,21,23,24 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-6 * |