blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971667

EP0971667 - HIGH PERMEABILITY LINER WITH IMPROVED INTAKE AND DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STOKES, Ty, Jackson
4535 Sutton Lane
Suwanee, GA 30174 / US
02 / CLARK, Darryl, Franklin
10365 Plantation Bridge Drive
Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US
03 / VARONA, Eugenio, Go
3309 Woodrun Trail
Marietta, GA 30062 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al
Diehl & Partner GbR
Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date98910396.513.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US05024
Priority number, dateUS1997082927331.03.1997         Original published format: US 829273
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843587
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971667
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971667
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/15, D04H1/54, A61F13/46
[2000/03]
CPC:
A61F13/512 (EP,KR,US); D04H1/4382 (KR); A61F13/5148 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/4291 (KR); D04H1/5412 (EP,KR,US); D04H1/5414 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/5416 (EP,KR,US); D04H1/544 (EP,KR,US); A61F2013/15284 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/51011 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:EINLAGE HOHER DURCHLÄSSIGKEIT MIT VERBESSERTER AUFNAHME UND VERTEILUNG[2002/34]
English:HIGH PERMEABILITY LINER WITH IMPROVED INTAKE AND DISTRIBUTION[2000/03]
French:GARNITURE A HAUTE PERMEABILITE ET DISTRIBUTION ET ABSORPTION AMELIOREES[2002/05]
Former [2000/03]EINLAGE HOHER DURCHLÄSSIGKEIT MIT VERBESSERTER SAUGFÄHIGKEIT UND VERTEILUNG
Former [2000/03]GARNITURE HAUTE IMPERMEABILITE A DISTRIBUTION ET ABSORPTION AMELIOREES
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
08.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
24.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2002Fee for grant paid
10.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
SE11.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
[2004/04]
Former [2003/51]BE11.12.2002
NL11.12.2002
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL11.12.2002
SE11.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE11.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH03241079  ;
 [A]JPH08322881  ;
 [PA]WO9723182  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [PA] 1-16 * page 13, line 6 - page 18, line 21; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5294478  (WANEK MARY C [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1,2,7,8 *;
 [PAD]WO9724482  (KIMBELY CLARK CORP [US]) [PAD] 1-16 * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0672774  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0633009  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920124), vol. 016, no. 029, Database accession no. (C - 0904), & JP03241079 A 19911028 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, & JP08322881 A 19961210 (NEW OJI PAPER CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.