EP1027015 - CONTROLLED RELEASE OF PHARMACEUTICALS IN THE ANTERIOR CHAMBER OF THE EYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IOLTECH 10 Avenue Paul Langevin 17180 Perigny / FR | [2005/24] |
Former [2004/46] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
IOLTECH 10 Avenue Paul Langevin 17180 Perigny / FR | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2004/23] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
IOLTECH SA Avenue Paul Langevin 17000 La Rochelle / FR | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Ciba Vision AG, Hettlingen Riethofstrasse 1 8442 Hettlingen / CH | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Galin, Miles A. 3rd floor, 345 East 37th Street New York, NY 10016 / US | ||
For all designated states Salamone, Joseph C. 2202 N.W. 62nd Drive Boca Raton, Florida 33496 / US | |||
For all designated states Israel, Stanley C. 675 West Street Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galin, Miles A. 345 E. 37th Street New York, NY 10016 / US | 02 /
Salamone, Joseph C. 2202 N.W. 62nd Drive Boca Raton, Florida 33496 / US | 03 /
Israel, Stanley C. 675 West Street Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | [2001/38] |
Former [2000/33] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Lewitter, Herbert, et al Santarelli 12 avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Lewitter, Herbert, et al Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande-Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2001/38] | Dietz, Jörg-Reimar, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2001/26] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/33] | Symes, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98910483.1 | 18.03.1998 | [2000/33] | WO1998US05320 | Priority number, date | US19970819255 | 18.03.1997 Original published format: US 819255 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841171 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1027015 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027015 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/14, A61K9/00 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/46 (EP,US);
A61F2/14 (KR);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/221 (EP,US);
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/728 (EP,US);
A61K31/765 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61L31/042 (EP,US);
A61L31/048 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/08 (EP);
A61F9/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/765, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/33] | A61F2/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Extension states | AL | 16.09.1999 | LT | 16.09.1999 | LV | 16.09.1999 | MK | 16.09.1999 | RO | 16.09.1999 | SI | 16.09.1999 | Title | German: | KONTROLLIERTE ABGABE VON PHARMAZEUTIKA IN DER VORDEREN AUGENKAMMER | [2000/33] | English: | CONTROLLED RELEASE OF PHARMACEUTICALS IN THE ANTERIOR CHAMBER OF THE EYE | [2000/33] | French: | LIBERATION CONTROLEE DE PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES DANS LA CHAMBRE ANTERIEURE DE L'OEIL | [2000/33] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 16.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 18.03.2005 | LU | 18.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2016/52] |
Former [2007/26] | IE | 18.03.2005 | |
LU | 18.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | IE | 18.03.2005 | |
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | IE | 18.03.2005 | |
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | MC | 31.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1113760 (BARNES HIND LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,4,36 * page 1, line 40 - line 51 * * claim 1 *; | [X]DE2636559 (HYDROPHILICS INT INC) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,9,10 *; | [A]US4931279 (BAWA RAJAN [US], et al) [A] 1-4,36 * column 9, line 42 - column 10, line 13 * * example - ** claims 1,6 *; | [XY]US5318780 (VIEGAS TACEY X [US], et al) [X] 1-4,36 * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 53 * * column 6, line 35 - line 51 * * claim 1 * [Y] 1,5-35; | [X]US5442053 (DELLA VALLE FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,36 * column 14, line 18 - line 35 *; | [Y]WO9632951 (GALIN MILES A [US], et al) [Y] 1,5-35 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]EP0333516 ; | [Y] - CHAN ET AL, "Liquid Topical Ophthalmic or Injectable Anaesthetic Comprises Rodocaine or its Pharmaceutically Acceptable Salt", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 38, Database accession no. 1989-272270, XP002905896 & EP0333516 A1 19890920 (IOLAB CORPORATION) |