blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968451

EP0968451 - MICROSCOPE SLIDE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.03.2008  [2008/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
1192062 Alberta Limited
1700,635- 8th Avenue S.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2P 3Z1 / CA
[2006/19]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Northern Edge Associates Inc.
P.O. Box 23
Bolton, Ontario L7E 5T1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / RICHARDSON, Timothy, M.
16 Matson Drive
Bolton, Ontario L7E 5R8 / CA
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff
CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/12]Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Three Trinity Court 21-27 Newport Road
Cardiff, CF24 0AA / GB
Former [2002/01]Davies, Gregory Mark, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales
Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Former [2000/01]Austin, Hedley William, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road
Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Application number, filing date98910560.620.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998CA00249
Priority number, dateUS19970041280P21.03.1997         Original published format: US 41280 P
US1997087024205.06.1997         Original published format: US 870242
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843123
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968451
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:G02B21/34, B01L3/00
[2000/01]
CPC:
G02B21/34 (EP,US); B01L3/502715 (EP); B01L3/508 (EP,US);
B01L2200/027 (EP); B01L2300/0627 (EP); B01L2300/0822 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0877 (EP,US); Y10T436/25 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:MIKROSKOPISCHES OBJEKTTRÄGERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG[2000/01]
English:MICROSCOPE SLIDE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF USE[2000/01]
French:SYSTEME DE LAMES POUR MICROSCOPE ET SON UTILISATION[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
24.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/12]
05.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/12]
Request for further processing for:10.01.2006Request for further processing filed
12.01.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.02.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4674846  (LIPPMAN ROBERT [US]);
 [A]US4790640  (NASON FREDERIC L [US]);
 [A]DE3915920  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]);
 [YA]US5349436  (FISCH HARRY [US]);
 [A]EP0617282  (DIFCO LAB [US]);
 [YA]WO9531529  (BIOMED DIAGNOSTICS INC [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.