EP0952121 - PROCESS FOR PURIFICATION OF WASTE WATERS AND CONTAMINANT SPILLS BASED ON THE USE OF CULTIVATED EMERGENT MACROPHYTES CONVERTED INTO FLOATING CULTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSIDAD POLITECNICA DE MADRID Avenida Ramiro de Maeztu, 7 28040 Madrid / ES | [2002/44] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states UNIVERSIDAD POLITECNICA DE MADRID Ramiro de Maeztu, 7 s/n 28040 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDEZ, Jesus E.T.S.I. Agronomos Ciudad Universitaria, s/n. E-28040 Madrid / ES | [2002/42] |
Former [1999/43] | 01 /
FERNANDEZ, Jes(RTM)s E.T.S.I. Agr(RTM)nomos Ciudad Universitaria, s/n. E-28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 98910752.9 | 02.04.1998 | [1999/43] | WO1998ES00086 | Priority number, date | ES19970000706 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: ES 9700706 | [1999/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9845213 | Date: | 15.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952121 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952121 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/32 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C02F3/327 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABWÄSSERN UND VERUNREINIGTEN ÜBERLAUFWÄSSERN BASIEREND AUF IN SCHWIMMENDE FORM UMGEWANDELTEN KULTUREN VON AUFTRETENDEN MAKROPHYTEN | [1999/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PURIFICATION OF WASTE WATERS AND CONTAMINANT SPILLS BASED ON THE USE OF CULTIVATED EMERGENT MACROPHYTES CONVERTED INTO FLOATING CULTURES | [1999/43] | French: | PROCEDE D'EPURATION D'EAUX RESIDUELLES ET DE REVERSEMENTS DE POLLUANTS AU MOYEN DE CULTURES DE MACROPHYTES EMERGENTES DEVENUES FLOTTANTES | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1998 | Translation filed | 24.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 24.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2003 | BE | 18.06.2003 | FI | 18.06.2003 | NL | 18.06.2003 | DK | 18.09.2003 | SE | 18.09.2003 | [2016/07] |
Former [2015/21] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
DE | 19.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
BE | 18.06.2003 | ||
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
DE | 19.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
DE | 19.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
FI | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 18.06.2003 | |
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 18.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0833899 ; | [X]JPH0929283 ; | [X]JPH0440296 ; | [X]JPS63209795 ; | [Y]DE2129711 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT); | [Y]US4415450 (WOLVERTON BILLY C [US]); | [Y]DE3011276 ; | [X]DD277905 (WASSERWIRTSCHAFTSDIREKTION BER [DD]); | [X]EP0405571 (ROGMANS MARIA [DE], et al); | [X]WO9306050 (SPACE BIOSPHERES VENTURE [US]); | [X]WO9429226 (PHYTOTECH INC [US]); | [X]ES2074159T (LEMNA CORP); | [X]WO9626906 (LEMNA CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO9636568 (UNIV RUTGERS [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP08033899 A 19960203 (SHIMIZU) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP09029283 A 19970204 (TARUSHIN) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP04040296 A 19920210 (FUJITA) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP63209795 A 19880831 (IGARASHI HIROSHI) | [Y] - HENRIQUES & FERNANDEZ., "Metal uptake and distribution in rush (Juncus conglomeratus L.) plants growing in pyrites mine tailing at Lousal, Portugal", THE SCIENCE OF TOTAL ENVIRONMENT,, AMSTERDAM, HOLLAND,, (1991), vol. 102, pages 253 - 260 | [Y] - STEFANI ET AL., "Juncus acutus: germination and initial growth in presence of heavy metals", ANNALES BOT, FENNICI,, HELSINKI, FINLAND,, (1991), vol. 28, pages 37 - 43 |