blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973972

EP0973972 - CALENDERING METHOD AND A CALENDER THAT MAKES USE OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
[2001/43]
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
Metso Paper, Inc.
P O Box 1220
00130 Helsinki / FI
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
Valmet Corporation(Reg.No.763281)
Fabianinkatu 9 A
00130 Helsinki / FI
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
VALMET CORPORATION
Panuntie 6
00620 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / VILJANMAA, Mika
Otsolahdentie 18 A 6
FIN-02110 Espoo / FI
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Salonen, Esko Tapani
Forssén & Salomaa Oy
Lautatarhankatu 8 B
00580 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Salonen, Esko Tapani
Forssén & Salomaa Oy, Yrjönkatu 30
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98910783.426.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998FI00270
Priority number, dateFI1997000134302.04.1997         Original published format: FI 971343
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9844196
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973972
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973972
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:D21G1/00, D21G1/02
[2000/04]
CPC:
D21G1/006 (EP,US); D21G1/0066 (EP,US); D21G1/0233 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM KALANDRIEREN UND EIN KALANDER ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS[2000/04]
English:CALENDERING METHOD AND A CALENDER THAT MAKES USE OF THE METHOD[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE DE CALANDRAGE ET CALANDRE UTILISANT LEDIT PROCEDE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
04.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2001Fee for grant paid
17.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0018954  (NORDISKAFILT AB [SE]) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [DA]US4596633  (ATTWOOD BRIAN W [GB]) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [A]EP0337973  (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9534714  (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0617165
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.