EP0914054 - DEVICE FOR THE COLD PRESERVATION OF MEAL SERVICE TRAYS WITH IN-BUILT HEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Italinnova S.A.S Di Grandi Rene Vincent & C Via Marco 4 22060 Campione d'Italia / IT | [1999/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANDI, René Via Marco, 4 I-22060 Campione d'Italia / IT | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Roman, Michel Cabinet Roman 35, rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | Roman, Michel CABINET ROMAN 35, rue Paradis 13001 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 98910825.3 | 25.02.1998 | [1999/19] | WO1998FR00365 | Priority number, date | FR19970002391 | 26.02.1997 Original published format: FR 9702391 | [1999/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9837797 | Date: | 03.09.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914054 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47J39/00, F25D3/06 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
A47J39/006 (EP);
F25D3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1999/19] | Title | German: | GERÄT FÜR DIE KÜHLE AUFBEWAHRUNG VON SERVIERPLATTEN MIT LOKALER ERHITZUNG | [2002/11] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE COLD PRESERVATION OF MEAL SERVICE TRAYS WITH IN-BUILT HEATING | [1999/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA CONSERVATION FROIDE DE PLATEAUX REPAS AVEC RECHAUFFEMENT LOCALISE | [1999/19] |
Former [1999/19] | GERÄT ZUM AUFBEWAHREN VON SERVIERPLATTEN MIT LOKALER ERHITZUNG | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 01.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/12] | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2662592 (GRANDI RENE) [DA] 1,5,7 * page 5, line 6 - line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9610723 (GRANDI RENE VINCENT [IT]) [A] 1,4,6,9 * abstract * * page 5, line 21 - line 31 * * page 7, line 11 - line 37 *; | [A]US4590773 (HOSHINO AKICHIKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column A; figure 1 * * column 2, line 10 - line 44 *; | [A]US4976308 (FAGHRI AMIR [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]WO9007687 (AIR PREHEATER [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | FR2662592 | FR2752288 |