EP0970311 - JOINT FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Titus International PLC Ridgeway Industrial Estate Iver Buckinghamshire SL0 9HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Titus International PLC Ridgeway Industrial Estate Iver, Buckinghamshire SL0 9HW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALLANCE, William, Ernest, Taylor 22 Cedar Drive, Marlow Bottom, Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3QB / GB | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Pendered, Timothy George, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Pendered, Timothy George, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98910861.8 | 05.03.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998GB00723 | Priority number, date | GB19970004985 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9704985 | GB19970008955 | 01.05.1997 Original published format: GB 9708955 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9840634 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0970311 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0970311 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/20 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
F16B12/2009 (EP,US);
F16B12/2036 (EP,US);
A47B2230/0033 (EP,US);
Y10T403/4602 (EP,US);
Y10T403/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/46] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT | [2000/02] | English: | JOINT FORMING DEVICE | [2000/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF FORMANT UN JOINT | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 16.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Request for further processing for: | 10.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2003 | Decision despatched | 15.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2003 | BE | 17.09.2003 | CH | 17.09.2003 | FI | 17.09.2003 | LI | 17.09.2003 | NL | 17.09.2003 | GR | 17.12.2003 | SE | 17.12.2003 | PT | 26.12.2003 | IE | 05.03.2004 | LU | 05.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2014/11] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
IE | 05.03.2004 | ||
LU | 05.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
LU | 05.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
CH | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
LI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
SE | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 17.09.2003 | |
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 17.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5567081 (VALLANCE WILLIAM E T [GB]) [DA] 1-28* the whole document * |