blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975627

EP0975627 - 5-(2-IMIDAZOLINYLAMINO)BENZIMIDAZOLE COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS ALPHA-2 ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CUPPS, Thomas, Lee
193 North Broad Street
Norwich, NY 13815 / US
02 / BOGDAN, Sophie, Eva
714 East Foster-Maineville Road
Maineville, OH 45039 / US
03 / MIELING, Glen, Edward
7395 Desert Spring Court
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
04 / NIKOLAIDES, Nick
5357 Prescott Court
Mason, OH 45040 / US
05 / HENRY, Raymond, Todd
877 Hechterman Road
Pleasant Plain, OH 45162 / US
06 / SHELDON, Russell, James
5023 Winton Road
Fairfield, OH 45014 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)McKinney, Victoria, et al
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centers Limited
Lovett House
Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Woof, Victoria, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centers Limited, Lovett House, Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
Application number, filing date98910927.709.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998IB00540
Priority number, dateUS19970042316P15.04.1997         Original published format: US 42316 P
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846595
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975627
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07D403/12, A61K31/415
[2000/05]
CPC:
C07D403/12 (EP,KR); A61P43/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:5-(2-IMIDAZOLINYLAMINO)BENZIMIDAZOL-VERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ALPHA-2-ANDRENOCEPTOR-AGONISTEN[2000/05]
English:5-(2-IMIDAZOLINYLAMINO)BENZIMIDAZOLE COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS ALPHA-2 ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS[2000/05]
French:COMPOSES DE 5-(2-IMIDAZOLINYLAMINO)BENZIMIDAZOLE UTILES EN TANT QU'AGONISTES DE L'ADRENORECEPTEUR ALPHA-2[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
01.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/21]
14.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]US5091528  (GLUCHOWSKI CHARLES [US]) [AD] 1,4,5* column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 68; claim 3 *;
 [AD]US5478858  (CUPPS THOMAS L [US], et al) [AD] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [DX]WO9604270  (SYNAPTIC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *;
 [D]US5541210  (CUPPS THOMAS L [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.