blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976745

EP0976745 - 4-TETRAHYDROPYRIDYLPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD
24-1 Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku
Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/33]For all designated states
TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD
24-1 Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku
Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD
24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku
Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAZATO, Atsuro, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
02 / KUMAGAI, Toshihito, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
03 / OKUBO, Taketoshi, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
04 / AIBE, Izumi, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
05 / TANAKA, Hideo, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
06 / CHAKI, Shigeyuki, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
07 / OKUYAMA, Shigeru, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
08 / TOMISAWA, Kazuyuki, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd
24-1, Takata 3-chome
Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-8633 / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas, et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al
Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date98911002.825.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998JP01330
Priority number, dateJP1997007289926.03.1997         Original published format: JP 7289997
JP1997033843909.12.1997         Original published format: JP 33843997
[2000/05]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842699
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976745
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976745
Date:13.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:C07D401/04, A61K31/505, C07D405/14, C07D409/14
[2001/47]
CPC:
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/505 (KR); A61P25/08 (EP);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US); C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US)
Former IPC [2000/05]C07D401/04, A61K31/505
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:4-TETRAHYDROPYRIDYLPYRIMIDIN-DERIVATE[2000/05]
English:4-TETRAHYDROPYRIDYLPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES[2000/05]
French:DERIVES DE 4-TETRAHYDROPYRIDYLPYRIMIDINE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase22.09.1999Translation filed 
22.09.1999National basic fee paid 
22.09.1999Search fee paid 
22.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
22.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
25.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2003Fee for grant paid
04.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchJPS4911705B  [ ] (DAIICHI SEIYAKA CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO9510506  (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 63; examples 37,268; claim 1 * * page 72 *;
 [A]  - UENO, KATSUJIRO ET AL, "Aminoalkylpyrazole derivatives", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 81:91517, URL: STN, XP002178418 [A] 1-7 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH07509725  ;
 [A]WO9533750  (PFIZER [US], et al);
 [A]WO9533727  (PFIZER [US], et al);
 [A]JPH08500121
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.