EP0920940 - SPINDLE FOR MACHINE TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sodick Co., Ltd. 12-1, Nakamachidai 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states Sodick Co., Ltd. 12-1, Nakamachidai 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIDATE, Akitake, M.C.Sodick Co., Ltd. 12-1, Nakamachidai 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8522 / JP | 02 /
SUGAHARA, Masami, M.C.Sodick Co., Ltd. 12-1, Nakamachidai 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8522 / JP | 03 /
MISAWA, Keita, M.C.Sodick Co., Ltd. 12-1, Nakamachidai 3-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8522 / JP | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98911079.6 | 27.03.1998 | [1999/23] | WO1998JP01418 | Priority number, date | JP19970095172 | 28.03.1997 Original published format: JP 9517297 | [1999/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843764 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0920940 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23B19/02, B23Q1/70, F16C3/02 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B23Q1/70 (EP,US);
B23B31/263 (EP,US);
B23Q11/04 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309352 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309464 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/23] | B23B19/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/23] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINE SPINDEL | [1999/23] | English: | SPINDLE FOR MACHINE TOOLS | [1999/23] | French: | BROCHE DE MACHINE-OUTIL | [1999/23] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1998 | Translation filed | 08.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 08.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/44] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS61131840 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JPS6288502U ; | [Y]JPH0947903 (ENSHU SEISAKU KK, et al) |