EP0915066 - DIELECTRIC CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND DIELECTRIC RESONATOR MADE BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA CORPORATION 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAWA, Shunichi Kyocera Corporation Kagoshima Kokubu Factory 1-1, Yamashita-cho Kokubu-shi Kagoshima 899-4312 / JP | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/19] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98911165.3 | 02.04.1998 | [1999/19] | WO1998JP01512 | Priority number, date | JP19970083656 | 02.04.1997 Original published format: JP 8365697 | JP19970172576 | 27.06.1997 Original published format: JP 17257697 | [1999/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9843924 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0915066 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0915066 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/46, C04B35/50, H01B3/12, C04B35/462, H01P7/10 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
C04B35/478 (EP,US);
H01B3/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/19] | C04B35/46, C04B35/50, H01B3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, SE [1999/19] | Title | German: | DIELEKTRISCHE KERAMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND RESONATOR DARAUS | [1999/19] | English: | DIELECTRIC CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND DIELECTRIC RESONATOR MADE BY USING THE SAME | [1999/19] | French: | COMPOSITION CERAMIQUE DIELECTRIQUE ET RESONATEUR DIELECTRIQUE CON U A PARTIR DE CETTE COMPOSITION | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.1998 | Translation filed | 04.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 04.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS62297260 (TDK CORP); | [Y]JPS63292508 (NIPPON DENSO CO, et al); | [X]JPH03261653 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [Y]JPH0877829 (KYOCERA CORP) |