blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978288

EP0978288 - MEDICINAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2012  [2012/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astellas Pharma Inc.
3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2006/01]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMOJO, Fumio
2-2-13, Daiwahigashi
Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0111 / JP
02 / KIMURA, Sumihisa
1-5-95, Seiwadainishi
Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0143 / JP
03 / HIROSE, Takeo
Chayacho 525 Yamatoojidori Shomensagaru
Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0933 / JP
04 / UEDA, Satoshi
1-16-3, Shinden
Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0125 / JP
05 / IBUKI, Rinta
7, Koyama Higashigenicho
Kita-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 603-8104 / JP
06 / OHNISHI, Norio
10, Sagatenryujikitatukurimichicho
Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8374 / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Brucknerstraße 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck
Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98911222.207.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998JP01585
Priority number, dateJP1997009371511.04.1997         Original published format: JP 9371597
[2000/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9846268
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978288
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2006
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/14
[2000/06]
CPC:
A61K31/436 (EP,US); A61K47/14 (EP,KR,US); A61K47/44 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2000/06]
English:MEDICINAL COMPOSITION[2000/06]
French:COMPOSITION MEDICAMENTEUSE[2000/06]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase24.09.1999Translation filed 
24.09.1999National basic fee paid 
24.09.1999Search fee paid 
24.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
24.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
16.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/17]
06.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201114   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9506464  (GALENIK LABOR FREIBURG GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * example 2 *;
 [X]WO9501785  (GALENIK LABOR FREIBURG GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * example 4 *;
 [X]DE4418115  (SANDOZ AG [CH]) [X] 1-7 * example - *;
 [X]EP0428169  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * example - *;
 [X]EP0423714  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * example - *
International search[A]JPH04103525  (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO);
 [A]JPS62277321  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO);
 [A]JPS61148181  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.