blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971892

EP0971892 - NOVEL PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.09.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 30.10.2002  [2002/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2000/35]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
AstraZeneca UK Limited
15 Stanhope Gate
London W1Y 6LN / GB
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Astra Pharmaceuticals Limited
Home Park
Kings Langley, Herts WD4 8DH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CHESHIRE, David
46 Park Road
Chilwell Nottingham NG9 4DA / GB
02 / CLADINGBOEL, David
58 Hawcliffe Road
Mountsorrel Leics LE12 7AH / GB
03 / HIRST, Simon
1 Blake Road
West Bridgford Notts NG2 5JJ / GB
04 / MANNERS, Carol
6 Cohen Close
Arnold Nottingham NG5 6RL / GB
05 / STOCKS, Michael
91 Dovedale Avenue
Long Eaton Nottingham NG10 3HT / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta, et al
Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]As Sivborg, Susanne Birgitta, et al
Astra AB, Intellectual Property, Patents
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Application number, filing date98911337.820.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998SE00505
Priority number, dateSE1997000110025.03.1997         Original published format: SE 9701100
SE1997000219909.06.1997         Original published format: SE 9702199
SE1997000440328.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704403
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9842670
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971892
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07D213/30, A61K31/44
[2000/03]
CPC:
C07D213/30 (EP,KR,US); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); C07D207/09 (KR);
C07D295/067 (KR); C07D401/12 (KR); C07D413/12 (KR);
C07F5/025 (EP,US); C07F7/1804 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesLT25.10.1999
LV25.10.1999
MK25.10.1999
RO25.10.1999
SI25.10.1999
TitleGerman:NEUE PYRIDINDERIVATE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN[2000/03]
English:NOVEL PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM[2000/03]
French:NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE PYRIDINE ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES QUI LES RENFERMENT[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase25.10.1999National basic fee paid 
25.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
16.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
03.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/44]
13.06.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0264114  (SEARLE & CO [US]);
 [A]EP0267439  (SEARLE & CO [US]);
 [A]WO9720815  (ASTRA PHARMA PROD [GB], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.