EP0973388 - UNSATURATED OXYALKYLENE ESTERS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEACON LABORATORIES, INC. P.O. Box 99 Phoenix Maryland 21131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Beacon Laboratories, Inc. P.O. Box 99 Phoenix, Maryland 21131 / US | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Beacon Laboratories, Inc. Wayne Plaza, Suite 303, 145 Route 46 West Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEISS, Edward 200 Charter Oak Drive New Cannan, CT 06840 / US | 02 /
LOEV, Bernard 19 Candlewood Terrace Medford, NJ 08500 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98911569.6 | 11.03.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998US04756 | Priority number, date | US19970814366 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: US 814366 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9839965 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973388 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/10, C07C69/76, A61K31/22, A61K31/34, A61K31/38 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
C07C69/65 (EP,US);
C07C69/618 (EP,US);
C07C69/734 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/04] | A01N37/10, C07C69/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Extension states | AL | 08.10.1999 | LT | 08.10.1999 | LV | 08.10.1999 | MK | 08.10.1999 | RO | 08.10.1999 | SI | 08.10.1999 | Title | German: | UNGESÄTTIGTE OXYALKYLEN-ESTER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2000/04] | English: | UNSATURATED OXYALKYLENE ESTERS AND USES THEREOF | [2000/04] | French: | ESTERS OXYALKYLENE INSATURES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/29] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 31.03.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE2625688 (KLINGE CO CHEM PHARM FAB) [DX] 23-25,28; | [A]GB1533820 (KLINGE CO CHEM PHARM FAB) [A] 1 * page 2, line 2 - line 4 * * page 6; example 12; table 1 *; | [PX]WO9800127 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,22-26,28-36 * claims 1-4,7,10-44 *; | [ADX] - KISO Y ET AL, "ANTIHEPATOTOXIC PRINCIPLES OF CURCUMA LONGA RHIZOMES", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1983), vol. 49, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 185 - 187, XP008008264 [AD] 1 * page 185; table 1 * * page 187, column 1, lines 3-5 * [X] 23-25,28 | [DA] - NUDELMAN A ET AL, "NOVEL ANTICANCER PRODRUGS OF BUTYRIC ACID. 2", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1992), vol. 35, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 687 - 694, XP000651578 [DA] 1-6,22-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00082a009 | [A] - SALUNKHE D G ET AL, "POLYMER SUPPORTED REAGENTS: EFFICIENT METHOD FOR SYNTHESIS OF METHYLENE DIESTERS", BULLETIN DES SOCIETES CHIMIQUES BELGES, XX, XX, (1987), vol. 96, no. 3, ISSN 0037-9646, pages 247 - 248, XP008008269 [A] 23 * page 248; example B; table 1 * | [A] - HUANG ET AL, "Effects of Curcumin, DM-Curcumin, BDM-Curcumin and Tetrahydrocurcumin on 12-O-Tetradecanoylphorbol-13-Acetate-Induced Tumor Promotion", CARCINOGENESIS, XX, XX, (1995), vol. 16, no. 10, pages 2493 - 2497, XP002087734 [A] 1,23 * abstract * | [T] - NUDELMAN, ABRAHAM ET AL, "Novel Mutual Prodrug of Retinoic and Butyric Acids with Enhanced Anticancer Activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY (2000), 43(15), 2962-2966, XP001113025 [T] 1-6,22-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm990540a | International search | [X]DE2625688 (KLINGE CO CHEM PHARM FAB) |