EP1009872 - SPINNING RING HAVING IMPROVED TRAVELER BEARING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.B. Carter, Inc. 4801 York Highway Gastonia, NC 28052 / US | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENSON, Rio, H. 1918 Hollandale Drive Gastonia, NC 28054 / US | 02 /
POQUETTE, Gereon, E. 2778 Cherry Lane Denver, NC 28037 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | ||
Former [2000/25] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3 AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98911695.9 | 17.03.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US05146 | Priority number, date | US19970822151 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: US 822151 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841679 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009872 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1009872 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D01H7/60 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
D01H7/602 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | SPINNRING MIT LAGEROBERFLÄCHE FÜR LÄUTER | [2000/25] | English: | SPINNING RING HAVING IMPROVED TRAVELER BEARING SURFACE | [2000/25] | French: | ANNEAU DE FILATURE PRESENTANT UNE SURFACE D'APPUI POUR CURSEUR AMELIOREE | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.2003 | BE | 25.06.2003 | CH | 25.06.2003 | FI | 25.06.2003 | FR | 25.06.2003 | IT | 25.06.2003 | LI | 25.06.2003 | NL | 25.06.2003 | DK | 25.09.2003 | GR | 25.09.2003 | PT | 25.09.2003 | SE | 25.09.2003 | ES | 22.12.2003 | IE | 17.03.2004 | LU | 17.03.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
FR | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
LU | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
LU | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
LU | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
DK | 25.09.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
BE | 25.06.2003 | ||
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
PT | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
NL | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
SE | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
FI | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 25.06.2003 | |
CH | 25.06.2003 | ||
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 25.06.2003 | |
LI | 25.06.2003 | ||
GR | 25.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 25.06.2003 | |
LI | 25.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR963970 (MAURICE KNOTHE) [X] 1 * claim . *; | [X]DE843490 (RIETER JOH JACOB & CIE AG) [X] 1,2 * claim 6 *; | [X]CH295966 (RIETER JOH JACOB & CIE AG [CH]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1-4 *; | [X]US2970425 (FOARD JOHN H) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-14 * column 2, line 4 - line 5 * * column 2, line 72 *; | [A]US4846122 (KRISTOF JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 3, line 8 - line 10 * * column 4, line 42 - line 53 ** column 6, line 16 - line 21 *; | [A]US5313773 (POQUETTE GERRY E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - line 26 * |