EP1006845 - RECIPROCATING MOVEMENT PLATFORM FOR SHIFTING SUBJECT TO AND FRO IN HEADWARDS-FOOTWARDS DIRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NON-INVASIVE MONITORING SYSTEMS, INC. 1840 West Avenue Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US | [2006/26] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states NON-INVASIVE MONITORING SYSTEMS, INC. 1840 West Avenue Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states NIMS, INC 1840 west Avenue Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACKNER, Marvin, A. 300 West Rivo Alto Miami Beach, FL 33139 / US | 02 /
INMAN, D., Michael 759 N.E. 75th Street Miami, FL 33138 / US | 03 /
MEICHNER, William, J. 5151 Ulmer Road Royal Oak, MD 21662 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98911766.8 | 13.03.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US05291 | Priority number, date | US19970040457P | 14.03.1997 Original published format: US 40457 P | US19970064541P | 05.11.1997 Original published format: US 64541 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9839996 | Date: | 17.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006845 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006845 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47D9/02, A47C21/00, A61H1/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
A61H1/003 (EP);
A47C21/006 (EP);
A61H1/001 (EP);
A61H31/00 (EP);
A61H31/005 (EP);
A61H31/006 (EP);
A61H31/008 (EP);
A61M21/00 (EP);
A61H2023/0209 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (EP);
A61H2201/5064 (EP);
A61H2203/0456 (EP);
A61H2230/04 (EP);
A61H2230/08 (EP);
A61H2230/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/24] | A47D9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | HIN- UND HERBEWEGENDE PLATTFORM FÜR DIE BEWEGUNG EINER PERSON NACH VORNE UND HINTEN IN KOPF-FUSS RICHTUNG | [2000/24] | English: | RECIPROCATING MOVEMENT PLATFORM FOR SHIFTING SUBJECT TO AND FRO IN HEADWARDS-FOOTWARDS DIRECTION | [2000/24] | French: | PLATE-FORME A MOUVEMENT DE VA-ET-VIENT SERVANT A DEPLACER UN SUJET D'AVANT EN ARRIERE DANS UN SENS TETE-PIEDS | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 02.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2005 | 25.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2006 | BE | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | IE | 13.03.2007 | LU | 13.03.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/15] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
IE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3950799 (FRANK ULRICH ANTON); | [YA]US4619270 (MARGOLIS FREDERICK J [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column A; figure - * [A] 4-6,10,12,14-16,18,21,22,25,27-30,34; | [YA]US5520614 (MCNAMARA JACK [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 37 - column 4; figure - * [A] 10,11,14-16,18,21,22,25,27-30,34 | International search | [A]US4934997 (SKAKAS PAULINE V [US]) |