EP1019133 - Rotatable control mechanism for steerable catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/29] | ROTATABLE CONTROL MECHANISM FOR STEERABLE CATHETER | ||
[2002/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | ||
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALWELL, Gary, S. 28 Trolley Street Manchester, NH 03109 / US | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/29] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 2517 KZ Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98911769.2 | 17.03.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998US05308 | Priority number, date | US19970818353 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: US 818353 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841275 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019133 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019133 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A61M25/0147 (EP,US);
A61M25/0136 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/29] | Title | German: | Rotierbarer Kontrollmechanismus für einen steuerbaren Katheter | [2002/30] | English: | Rotatable control mechanism for steerable catheter | [2002/30] | French: | Mécanisme de commande rotatif de cathéter orientable | [2002/30] |
Former [2000/29] | ROTIERBARER KONTROLLMECHANISMUS FÜR STEUERBAREN KATHETER | ||
Former [2000/29] | ROTATABLE CONTROL MECHANISM FOR STEERABLE CATHETER | ||
Former [2000/29] | MECANISME DE COMMANDE ROTATIF DE CATHETER ORIENTABLE | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01205104.1 / EP1197240 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.08.2003 | [2004/13] | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3470876 (BARCHILON JOHN) [X] 10,11 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 20 * * figures 4-8 * [A] 17; | [YA]US3921295 (JAMES JOHN OLIVER) [Y] 1-5,8 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 25 * * figures 5-7 * [A] 13,15,16; | [YA]EP0521595 (LUNDQUIST INGEMAR H [US]) [Y] 1-5,8 * column 28, line 34 - column 30, line 4 * * figures 35A-35C,47-50 * [A] 12,14,17; | [X]EP0585473 (MAEDA IND [JP]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 1 * * column 9, line 18 - line 26 * * figures 5,9 *; | [A]WO9426347 (EP TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 10-13 * page 8, line 2 - page 10, line 8 * * figures 2,5-7 *; | [A]US5413107 (OAKLEY CLYDE G [US], et al) [A] 10* figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US5358478 | US5383852 | US5395327 |