blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972319

EP0972319 - COAXIAL JACK AND PLUG AVOIDING MISMATCH IMPEDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]COAXIAL SWITCHING JACK WITH SLIDING CENTER CONDUCTOR
[2001/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADC Telecommunications, Inc
12501 Whitewater Drive
Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / FINKE, Thomas, R.
982 County Road 24
Medina, MN 55391 / US
02 / SCHMIDT, John, D.
1804 Knox Drive
Burnsville, MN 55337 / US
03 / SAJADI, Ahmad
4368 Garden Terrace
Eagan, MN 55123 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Legg, Cyrus James Grahame, et al
ABEL & IMRAY, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98911988.823.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US05744
Priority number, dateUS1997083511604.04.1997         Original published format: US 835116
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9845905
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972319
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972319
Date:22.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/646
[2001/16]
CPC:
H01R24/46 (EP,US); H01R13/6473 (KR); H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
Y10S439/944 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/03]H01R17/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:KOAXIALER JACK UND STECKER, DIE EIN IMPEDANZ-MISSVERHÄLTNIS VERMEIDEN[2001/16]
English:COAXIAL JACK AND PLUG AVOIDING MISMATCH IMPEDANCE[2001/16]
French:JACK ET FICHE COAXIALS EVITANT DES DISCORDANCES D'IMPEDANCE[2001/16]
Former [2000/03]KOAXIALER SCHALTVERBINDER MIT VERSCHIEBBAREN INNENLEITER
Former [2000/03]COAXIAL SWITCHING JACK WITH SLIDING CENTER CONDUCTOR
Former [2000/03]FICHE JACK COAXIALE COMMUTATRICE A CONDUCTEUR CENTRAL TELESCOPIQUE
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
17.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
27.02.2002Fee for grant paid
27.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01104552.3  / EP1120866
Opposition(s)25.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20]
Request for further processing for:26.02.2002Request for further processing filed
27.02.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.03.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE22.05.2002
FI22.05.2002
GR22.05.2002
NL22.05.2002
DK22.08.2002
PT22.08.2002
SE22.08.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2003/48]BE22.05.2002
GR22.05.2002
NL22.05.2002
DK22.08.2002
PT22.08.2002
SE22.08.2002
Former [2003/46]GR22.05.2002
NL22.05.2002
DK22.08.2002
PT22.08.2002
SE22.08.2002
Former [2003/21]GR22.05.2002
NL22.05.2002
PT22.08.2002
SE22.08.2002
Former [2003/20]GR22.05.2002
NL22.05.2002
SE22.08.2002
Former [2003/09]NL22.05.2002
SE22.08.2002
Former [2002/46]SE22.08.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]DE9003258U  (PVT PRÄZISIONS-VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK UND STEUERUNGSBAU GMBH) [A] 1-3,12 * page 1 - page 14; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]GB2263591  (TRANSRADIO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-5,12 * page 1 - page 13; figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]US5246378  (SEICEANU AUREL [US]) [DA] 1,12* abstract *;
 [A]WO9513637  (NICOMATIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1 - page 8; figures 1-5 *
ExaminationEP0577277
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.